MacDonald v. Schriro, et al

Plaintiff: Allan S MacDonald
Defendant: Felix F Jabczenski
Case Number: 2:2004cv01001
Filed: May 18, 2004
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2009 267 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting Telephonic Status Hearing for 2/9/2009 04:00 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. Defendant Jabczenski's presence is welcome, but not required. That Mr. Andrew Jacobs shall appear at the telephonic status hearing to report on the sea rch for possible appointment of counsel for Plaintiff. Clerk of Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Mr. Andrew Jacobs, Snell & Wilmer, L.L.P., One South Church Avenue, Suite 1500, Tucson, Arizona 85701-1630. That Defendant's counsel shall initiate a conference call and secure all participants, including Plaintiff MacDonald and Mr. Andrew Jacobs, on the line before telephoning Judge McNamees chambers by 3:55 p.m., on February 9, 2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/21/09. (DMT, )
October 28, 2008 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER setting a telephonic status hearing before the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee for 11/24/08 at 4:00 p.m. Dft Jabczenski's presence is welcome, but not required. Dft's counsel shall initiate a conference call and secure all participants, including Pla MacDonald, on the line before telephoning Judge McNamee's chambers, no later than 3:55 p.m., on 11/24/08. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/28/08. (ESL)
October 23, 2008 261 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Pursuant to 260 Stipulation for Dismissal With Prejudice, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice against Defendants Dora Schriro, Dennis Kendall, Ronolfo Macabuhay, Richard Rowe, Conchita Tee, John Lockhart, Cesar Maderazo, Donald Sloan, Eduardo Vinluan, Georgiann Bevins, Bruce Kanter, Richard Pratt, Robert Jones, James Baird, Patricia Stapler, Julius Chaney, Larry Clausen, Gene Greeley, Sharon Malcolm, Nia Maxwell, Marilyn Wand, Starlet Whitney Grant, Rod Norrish, and Tina Muzzy. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/23/08. (SAT)
October 9, 2008 259 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 258 Stipulation: ORDERED that dft Carondelet Health Network dba St. Mary's Hospital be removed from the caption of all future pleadings filed in this case. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/9/2008. (LAD)
September 30, 2008 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to the parties 256 Stipulation of (Party) Dismissal: That dft Carondelet St. Mary's Hospital & Health Center is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees, including attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/26/08. (KMG, )
September 18, 2008 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Defendant Jabczeski's 251 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/17/08.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacDonald v. Schriro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan S MacDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix F Jabczenski
Represented By: Peter Akmajian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?