Hy Cite Corporation v. Badbusinessbureau.co, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Hy Cite Corporation
Defendant: Badbusinessbureau.com, LLC, Ed Magedson and Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Case Number: 2:2004cv02856
Filed: December 10, 2004
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2007 77 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE, including all claims and counterclaims, with prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) of the FedRCivP. Each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 5/10/07. (LSP)
May 9, 2007 76
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Badbusinessbureau.com, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
April 3, 2007 75
Notice re of Service of Discovery: Subpoenas by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC (Speth, Maria)
March 16, 2007 74
Notice re of Service of Discovery to Plaintiff by Badbusinessbureau.com, LLC, Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC (Speth, Maria)
March 13, 2007 73 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 72 STIPULATION Extending deadline for disclosing experts: Expert disclosures shall be due 4/16/07; Rebuttal disclosures shall be due 5/3/07; and Expert depositions if any shall be completed prior to 7/2/07. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 3/13/07. (MAP)
February 26, 2007 71 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting STIPULATION TO EXTEND DISCOVERY DEADLINE TO MAY 31, 2007. Discovery due by 5/31/2007. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 2/26/07. (LSP)
December 28, 2006 69
Notice re CORRECTED NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY AS COUNSEL OF RECORD by Hy Cite Corporation (Dana, Michael)
December 27, 2006 67
Notice re WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY AS COUNSEL OF RECORD by Hy Cite Corporation (Dana, Michael) Modified on 12/28/2006, DOCUMENT IS UNSIGNED, ATTORENY NOTICED TO REFILE, (LSP).
August 1, 2006 66 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER Discovery due by 2/28/2007. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 10/1/2007. Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2007 09:00 AM before Judge Earl H Carroll. Jury Trial set for 10/16/2007 09:00 AM before Judge Earl H Carroll. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall keep the Court apprised of the possibility of settlement.. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 7/31/06. (LCF)
July 27, 2006 64
REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Hy Cite Corporation. (Dana, Michael)
July 14, 2006 63
Notice re Change of Firm Affiliation by Hy Cite Corporation (Dana, Michael)
June 22, 2006 62 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 60 STIPULATION - vacating the scheduling conference set for 6/26/06. FURTHER ORDERED resetting the same as follows: Scheduling Conference is reset for 7/31/2006 10:15 AM before Judge Earl H Carroll.. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 6/20/06. (KMG, )
June 19, 2006 61
Additional Attachments to Main Document re 60 Stipulation / Proposed Order by Plaintiff Hy Cite Corporation. (Dana, Michael)
June 9, 2006 59
Notice re Change of Firm Affiliation by Hy Cite Corporation (Dana, Michael)
May 11, 2006 58 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting 57 STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Ed Magedson. Scheduling Conference reset for 6/26/2006 09:15 AM before Judge Earl H Carroll. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 05/09/06. (DNH)
May 8, 2006 57
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Continue Scheduling Conference by Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
April 27, 2006 56 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 55 STIPULATION re 54 Order, Set Hearings JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Hy Cite Corporation. Scheduling Conference set for 5/30/2006 09:00 AM before Judge Earl H Carroll. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 04/26/06. (KCS)
April 24, 2006 55
STIPULATION re 54 Order, Set Hearings JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Hy Cite Corporation. (Dana, Michael)
April 6, 2006 54 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re: Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2006 at 9:45 AM before Judge Earl H Carroll.. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 4/6/06. (TLJ)
February 10, 2006 52
REPLY to Response to Motion re 49 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
February 2, 2006 51
AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re 49 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Declaration of Kevin M. St. John filed by Hy Cite Corporation. (Dana, Michael)
January 30, 2006 49
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ed Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC. (Speth, Maria)
January 26, 2006 47 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 45 APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Hy Cite Corporation against Defendants badbusinessbureau.com, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC and Ed Magedson. (Dana, Michael). In-Court Hearing re: Application for Entry of Default Judgment is set for 1/30/2006 10:00 AM before Judge Earl H Carroll. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 01/25/06. (DNH, )
January 19, 2006 46
XCENTRIC VENTURES, LLC AND MAGEDSON'S ANSWER to Amended Complaint by Xcentric Ventures, LLC.(Speth, Maria)
January 17, 2006 45
APPLICATION for Entry of Default by Plaintiff Hy Cite Corporation against Defendants badbusinessbureau.com, LLC, Xcentric Ventures, LLC and Ed Magedson. (Dana, Michael)
December 27, 2005 44 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting in part and denying in part [19] Motion to Dismiss, granting [25] Motion for Partial Reconsideration, granting in part and denying in part [38] Motion to Dismiss; counts Six, Seven and Eight are dismissed for failure to state a claim; dft Ed Magedson shall not be required to pay pla all costs and fees incurred as a result of dfts avoidance of Service of Process . Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 12/27/05. (SBU, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hy Cite Corporation v. Badbusinessbureau.co, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hy Cite Corporation
Represented By: John C Scheller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badbusinessbureau.com, LLC
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Magedson
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?