Spina v. Maricopa Cty Trans, et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv00712
Filed: March 7, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 137 MCDOT's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. A Final Pre-Trial Conference will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/1/10.(LSP)
February 5, 2010 136 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 126 Motion for Summary Judgment. Dft's motion is granted as to sex discrimination, hostile work environment, and intentional infliction of emotional distress claims (Claims I, II and V). Dft's motion is denied as to the retaliation and section 1983 claims (Claims III, IV). The parties may file any summary judgment motions regarding the section 1983 claim only by 3/5/10. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/4/10.(LAD)
July 10, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dft's 131 Motion to Strike Footnote 2 of Pla's 130 Revised Response to Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment. It is further ordered that the Court will not consider Footnote 2 when ruling on the summary judgment motion. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 07/10/09. (ESL)
April 1, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 119 Motion for Leave to File Surrely FURTHER ORDERED striking Plaintiffs Surreply and Supplemental Statement of Facts 119 , 120 . Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/31/09.(MAP)
November 12, 2008 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 114 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to file Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiffs must file their response by 12/19/08, Defendants to file a reply by 2/2/09. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/10/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spina v. Maricopa Cty Trans, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?