Massoli v. Regan Media, et al Featured Case

Plaintiff Jenna Massoli (aka Jenna Jameson) allegedly entered into a contract with defendant Regan Media that related to the development, production, distribution and exploitation of projects featuring the plaintiff. Defendant alleges that plaintiff rejected a proposal from A&E regarding a reality television series, but plaintiff later negotiated a contract with A&E without defendant\'s participation in breach of the agreement between plaintiff and defendant.

Plaintiff: Jenna Massoli
Defendant: Regan Media and Judith Regan
Counter Defendant: Jay Grdina, Jenna Massoli and Dolce Amore, INc.
Counter Claimant: Regan Media and Judith Regan
Case Number: 2:2005cv00854
Filed: March 21, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2006 105 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER DISMISSING CASE pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, this action is dismissed in its entirety and all claims asserted therein with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 7/26/06. (SBU, )
May 31, 2006 103
NOTICE of Settlement by Jenna Massoli, Dolce Amore, INc., Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina (Limon-Wynn, Monica)
May 23, 2006 102 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting in part 68 Motion to Compel, and granting in part 78 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff/Counterdefendant and Counterdefendants shall respond fully and without objection to Defendant/Counterclaimant Regan Media's First Request for Production of Documents by May 31, 2006. Plaintiff/Counterdefendant and Counterdefendants shall sign their Responses to Defendant/Counterclaimant Regan Media's First Set of Interrogatories by May 31, 2006. Plaintiff/Counterdefendant and Counterdefendants shall pay, as agreed, Defendant/Counterclaimant Regan Media's reasonable expenses and attorneys' fees incurred in filing the Motion to Compel. Defendant/Count erclaimant Regan Media's request for reasonable expenses and attorneys' fees incurred in filing the Second Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions is DENIED, without prejudice to reurging upon the filing of a Supplemental Memorandum setting forth the reasonable expenses and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 05/22/06. (KCS)
May 4, 2006 99
NOTICE of Deposition of Dolce Amore, Inc., filed by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
April 19, 2006 98 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 97 STIPULATION To Modify Scheduling Order by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan. Discovery due by 8/31/2006. Dispositive motions due by 9/29/2006. Bench Trial set for 2/13/2007 09:00 AM before Judge Earl H Carroll. Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/5/2007 09:30 AM before Judge Earl H Carroll. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 04/17/06. (KCS)
April 14, 2006 97
STIPULATION To Modify Scheduling Order by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
April 5, 2006 96 Opinion or Order of the Court
IT IS ORDERED that the applications to withdraw 8385 are granted; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff/Counterdefendant and Counterdefendants' Motion for Extension of Time 87 is granted. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 4/4/06. (TLJ)
April 3, 2006 95
REPLY to Response to Motion re 78 Second MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctioins filed by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
March 24, 2006 94
RESPONSE in Opposition re 78 Second MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctioins filed by Jenna Massoli, Dolce Amore, INc., Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina. (Rauch, David)
March 23, 2006 92
NOTICE of Appearance by Monica Anne Limon-Wynn on behalf of Jenna Massoli, Dolce Amore, INc., Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina (Limon-Wynn, Monica)
March 16, 2006 90
RESPONSE re 83 Application to Withdraw as Counsel Filed by Lipsitz, Green, Fahringer, Roll, Salisbury & Cambria, LLP by Defendants Regan Media, Judith Regan, Counter Claimants Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
March 9, 2006 87
First MOTION for Extension of Time Within Which to Respond to Defendants/Counterclaimant Regan Media's Second Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions by Jenna Massoli, Dolce Amore, INc., Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina. (Hall, Roger)
March 7, 2006 86
DECLARATION of Attorney's Certificate of Compliance with LRCiv 83.3(b)(2)(A) re 85 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel Filed by Renaud Cook Drury Mesaros, PA by Plaintiff Jenna Massoli, Counter Defendants Dolce Amore, INc., Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina. (Hall, Roger)
February 21, 2006 82 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER finding as moot 34 Motion determination that Arizona law applies to this matter. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff/Counterdefendant and Counterdefendant'sMotion for Determination that Arizona Law Applies to this Matter [dkt. 34] is DENIEDas moot, without prejudice to reurging. Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 02/18/06. (KCS)
February 17, 2006 81
STATEMENT of Rule 37.1 in Support of Regan Media's Second Motion to Compel and Request for Sanctions re 78 Second MOTION to Compel and Request for Sanctioins by Defendants Regan Media, Judith Regan, Counter Claimants Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
February 9, 2006 77
Notice re Certificate of Service of Responses to Requests for Production by Dolce Amore, INc., Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina (Hall, Roger)
January 30, 2006 76
REPLY to Response to Motion re 68 MOTION to Compel filed by Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
January 24, 2006 75
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 74 Response to Motion filed by Jenna Massoli. Description of deficiency: Duplicate document filed (#74 is a duplicate of #73). (MAP, )
January 23, 2006 74
RESPONSE to Motion re 68 MOTION to Compel filed by Jenna Massoli, Dolce Amore, INc., Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina. (Hall, Roger). Modified on 1/24/2006 (MAP, ). DOCUMENT #74 IS A DUPLICATE FILING OF DOCUMENT #73.
January 11, 2006 72 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re 71 STIPULATION To Modify Scheduling Order Re Disclosure of Expert Witnesses by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media. (Blackhurst, Dennis) filed by Regan Media, Judith Regan. Defendants shall disclose expert witnesses, if any, no later than 03/03/06, together with a final written report setting forth the expert's opinion . Signed by Judge Earl H Carroll on 01/10/06. (DNH, )
January 10, 2006 71
STIPULATION To Modify Scheduling Order Re Disclosure of Expert Witnesses by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
January 5, 2006 70
STATEMENT of Moving Counsel in Support of Defendant/Counterclaimant Regan Media's Motion to Compel re 68 MOTION to Compel by Defendants Regan Media, Judith Regan, Counter Claimants Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
December 16, 2005 67
NOTICE of Deposition of Jenna Massoli p/k/a Jenna Jameson, filed by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
December 5, 2005 64
Notice re Certificate of Service by Jenna Massoli, Dolce Amore, INc., Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina of Responses to Defendant/Counterclaimant Regan Media's First Set of Interrogatories to Counterdefendants (Hall, Roger)
November 8, 2005 63
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dolce Amore, INc.. (Hall, Roger)
November 4, 2005 62
Notice re of Service of Defendant/Counterclaimant Regan Media's Discovery Requests by Regan Media, Regan Media (Blackhurst, Dennis)
November 2, 2005 58
Reply re 52 Amended Counterclaim, (Second Amended Counterclaim) by Plaintiff Jenna Massoli, Counter Defendants Dolce Amore, INc., Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina. (Hall, Roger)
October 20, 2005 57
STATEMENT of Rule 7.1 by Defendants Regan Media, Judith Regan, Counter Claimants Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
October 12, 2005 55
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 54 Waiver of Service Executed, filed by Regan Media, Judith Regan. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. (LSP)
October 4, 2005 53
Notice re Filing of Second Amended Counterclaim by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan (Blackhurst, Dennis)
October 3, 2005 50
REPLY to Response to Motion re 44 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants/Counterclaimants' Motion to Amend Counterclaim filed by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
September 28, 2005 49
STIPULATION TO VACATE OCTOBER 3, 2005 ORAL ARGUMENT by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
September 26, 2005 47
RESPONSE to Motion re 44 MOTION to Amend/Correct Defendants/Counterclaimants' Motion to Amend Counterclaim filed by Jenna Massoli, Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina. (Hall, Roger)
September 6, 2005 43
REPLY to Response to Motion re [19] Motion for Extension of Time Reply to Sur-Response filed by Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina. (Hall, Roger)
August 22, 2005 42
REPLY to Response to Motion re 34 MOTION for Determination that Arizona Law Applies to Case filed by Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina. (Hall, Roger)
August 18, 2005 41
RESPONSE in Opposition re [19] Motion for Extension of Time Sur-Response in Opposition to Plaintiff/Counterdefendants' Rule 56(f) Motion filed by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Blackhurst, Dennis)
August 17, 2005 40 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting [31] Motion for Leave to File Sur-Response. Dfts shall file Sur-Response w/in 20 days of the date of this Order FURTHER ORDERED that Pla shall have 10 days from the date the Sur-Response is filed to file a Reply FURTHER ORDEDED vacating the motion hearing set for 8/18/05 and resetting the same for 10/3/05 at 10:30am. Signed by Judge Earl H. Carroll on 8/17/05. (MAP, )
August 16, 2005 39
Reply re [31] MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Response in Opposition to Plaintiff/Counterdefendants' Rule 56(f) Motion by Defendants Regan Media, Judith Regan, Counter Claimants Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Bodney, David)
August 10, 2005 38
RESPONSE in Opposition re 34 MOTION for Determination that Arizona Law Applies to Case filed by Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan. (Bodney, David)
August 9, 2005 37
RESPONSE to Motion re [31] MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Response in Opposition filed by Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina. (Hall, Roger)
August 2, 2005 35 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER re [19] MOTION (Rule 56(f) to extend time to file their response to Defendants' Rule 12(c) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and Memorandum in Support thereof filed by pla/counter-defendant Jenna Massoli, counter-defendant Jay Grdina [19-1] (SAT) Hearing set as to [19] Rule 56(f) Motion; Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2005 at 03:00PM before Judge Earl H. Carroll. Signed by Judge Earl H. Carroll on 8/2/05. (LSP)
August 1, 2005 32
Notice re of Service by Jenna Massoli (Hall, Roger)
July 13, 2005 28 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting [27] STIPULATION for Extension of Time to 7/18/05 For Plaintiff/Counterdefendants to File Reply to Response in Opposition to Rule 56(f) Motion, by Jenna Massoli, Regan Media, Judith Regan, Regan Media, Judith Regan, Jenna Massoli, Jay Grdina. (RDS) filed by Jenna Massoli, Regan Media, Judith Regan, Jay Grdina . Signed by Judge Earl H. Carroll on 7/12/05. (LSP, )
July 5, 2005 25 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER granting [24] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Attorney Jeffrey F. ReinaSigned by Judge Earl H. Carroll on 6/30/05. (LSP, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massoli v. Regan Media, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jay Grdina
Represented By: Monica Anne Limon-Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Jenna Massoli
Represented By: David Eric Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Dolce Amore, INc.
Represented By: Monica Anne Limon-Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jenna Massoli
Represented By: David Eric Rauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regan Media
Represented By: David Jeremy Bodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith Regan
Represented By: David Jeremy Bodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Regan Media
Represented By: David Jeremy Bodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Judith Regan
Represented By: David Jeremy Bodney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?