Bradberry v. Schriro, et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv01336
Filed: May 5, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 12, 2010 268 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. The 254 Report and Recommendation is accepted in its entirety; the US Marshal shall effect personal service on Defendants Savage, Lewis, and Garvin within 1 month of the date of this Order; dismissing all claims against Defendants Tucker, Glass, and Atkins. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 1/12/10. (REW, )
November 6, 2009 254 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, Recommending that Defendants Tucker, Glass, and Atkins be dismissed as defendants in this matter; and further recommending that the Court order the United States Marshal to proceed with personal service on Defendants Savage, Lewis and Garvin and that the Court specify a date by which the Marshal must serve these Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 11/6/09. (REW, )
June 30, 2009 230 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the 228 Motion for Extension of Time is granted to the limited extent that Pla's supplemental response to the motion to dismiss is due by 07/15/09. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 06/30/09.(ESL, )
April 8, 2009 202 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED AFFIRMING the Magistrate Judge's 189 Report and Recommendations as modified and DENYING Plaintiff's 166 "Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Joinder of Additional Parties and Counts and For Good Cause to Add 3 Additional Pages to the Amended Complaint". Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 4/7/09.(SAT)
February 9, 2009 189 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 166 MOTION to Amend His Complaint: Recommending that the motion be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 2/6/2009. (LAD)
September 15, 2008 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Pla's 69 Appeal of the Magistrate Judges Order is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Pla's 93 Motion for Recusal is DENIED. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 09/15/08. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bradberry v. Schriro, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?