Lyon et al v. Gila River Indian Community

Case Number: 2:2005cv02045
Filed: July 11, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157 Motion for Withdrawal of Reference
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2015 474 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court enter judgment in favor of the Trustee and against the Community consistent with these Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (See document for further details). Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 3/31/15. (LAD)
May 15, 2014 407 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Stipulation to File Select Summary Judgment Exhibits and Accompanying References Under Seal 394 is denied. The lodged sealed filing (Doc. 395) is stricken but shall remain under seal. The Court has not considered the sealed filing (Doc. 395) in making its determination. Gila River Indian Community's Motion to Dismiss 396 is denied. Gila River Indian Community's Motion for Summary Judgment 396 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Trustee's Motion for Summary Judgment Regarding Scope of Implied Easement 392 is granted in part and denied in part. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 5/15/2014. (ALS)
October 21, 2013 384 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the Property Owners' 359 Motion to Intervene is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 10/21/2013.(TLB)
May 25, 2012 332 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the GRICs oral motion to strike and Motion to Strike 328 is granted in part and denied in part as set forth herein. The Clerk of the Court shall strike (1) the Declaration of Paul E. Gilbert, attached to the Trustees Motion for Hearing [ 320], Exhibit 1, (2) the Declaration of Michael K. Schugg, attached to the Trustees Response to the Motion for Final Judgment 323 Exhibit 1, (3) the Declaration of Paul E. Gilbert, attached to the Trustees Response to the Motion for Final Judgment 323 , Exhibit 2, and (4) the Declaration of Neal T. Pascoe attached to the Notice of Filing 326 , Exhibit 1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Gila River Indian Community's Motion for Entry of Final Judgment and Memorandum in Support 321 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Trustees Motion to Set Rule 16 Hearing and Postpone Entry of Judgment 320 is granted. A Rule 16 Conference will be set by separate Order of the Court. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 5/25/12.(TLJ)
November 25, 2008 302 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 299 Motion to Stay the Taxation of Costs Order Pending Resolution of the Parties' Appeals, however, execution on the taxation of costs order is stayed for 10 days from the date of this order to permit compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(d) if the Community so chooses. Signed by Judge James A Teilborg on 11/24/08.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyon et al v. Gila River Indian Community
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?