Golden West Holdings Trust v. United States of America et al

Case Number: 2:2005cv02237
Filed: July 27, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Recovery of IRS Tax
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Plaintiff's Motion to Enjoin [sic] Wachovia Bank's Response to the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment 95 is GRANTED; the making of the jeopardy assessment is reasonable under the circumstances pursuant to 26 U.S.C. § 7429; the Government's Motion for Summary Judgment 66 and Motion for Reconsideration of Order Granting Intervention 74 are DENIED as moot; Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint 21 is DISMISSED, and the Clerk shall terminate this matter (CV 05-2237, 05-2238, and 05-2239). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/21/09. (REW, )
January 9, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - setting a show cause hearing before the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee for Monday, February 2, 2009 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, Arizona 85003. FURTHER ORDERED that Dfts' counsel may appear telephonically at the show cause hearing. Dft's counsel shall telephone Judge McNamee's chambers at (602) 322-7555, no later than 9:25 a.m., on February 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/8/09. (KMG, )
November 17, 2008 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 84 Motion / Stipulation for Extension ofTime to File United States' Reply to Intervenor Wachovia Bank's response to motion for summary judgment.The United States to file a reply by December 19, 2008. All other provisions in the Scheduling Order dated July 13, 2007 (Dkt. 45) shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/15/08.(DMT, )
October 28, 2008 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiffs' 77 Motion for Extension of Time; the last day for Plaintiffs to file a response to the motion for summary judgment is extended to 12/4/08; all other provisions in the Scheduling Order dated 7/13/07 45 shall remain in effect. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/28/08.(REW, )
October 20, 2008 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Motion to file exhibits by non-electronic means. That United States will submit these exhibits to the Clerk of Court and opposing counsel on a CD-ROM disk containing the high- resolution files along with a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/20/08.(DMT, )
September 23, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Motion for Extension of Time. Dispositive motions due by 9/26/2008. All other provisions in the scheduling Order dated 7/13/07 45 shall remain in effect.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/22/08.(DMT, )
September 9, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion to Permit Sale of Seized Property. FURTHER ORDERED that the IRS may proceed to sell at public auction, after the proper notice and advertising according to law and regulation, the vehicles identified in Appendix A, attached , without minimum bid. FURTHER ORDERED that the IRS may apply the sale proceeds to the costs of sale and storage of all property seized from the plaintiffs, and then the net proceeds shall be deposited with Donald Powell of Arizona, the bankruptcy counsel of William Wadman, to be held in a blocked account pending further order of the Bankruptcy Court. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 09/09/08.(DNH)
February 7, 2008 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 46 Motion Permitting Sale of Seized Property pursuant to the terms of the parties' stipulation 51 .. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 02/07/08.(DNH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden West Holdings Trust v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?