Haskins v. Schriro

Case Number: 2:2005cv02352
Filed: August 4, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Referring Judge: Jacqueline J Marshall
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 30, 2009 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Magistrate Judge Marshall's 67 Report and Recommendation to the extent it is consistent with this Order. It is further ordered denying Petitioner's 53 Motion to Stay; denying Petitioner's 61 Motion to Amend Wri t of Habeas Corpus; denying as moot Arizona Department of Corrections' 48 Objection to the Court's granting Petitioners Motion for a Procedural Order; adopting in full Magistrate Judge's Marshall's previous 37 Report and Recom mendation to the extent it is consistent with the Court's Order conducting a de novo review. It is further ordered denying Petitioner's 1 habeas petition; directing the Clerk of the Court to close this case. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/30/09. (ESL)
February 11, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion to Stay; adopting 56 Report and Recommendations. FURTHER ORDERED requesting that US Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Marshall issue a Report and Recommendation on the issues and motions that remain pending in this action.... (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 2/10/2009. (LAD)
December 12, 2008 56 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION recommending deny 41 MOTION to Stay re Habeas Corpus proceedings pending appeal : ***** SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR FURTHER INFORMATION*****. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline J Marshall on 12/12/08. (LMF, )
September 16, 2008 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 37 Report and Recommendations re Petitioner's 26 Motion to Conduct limited Discovery. The motion is DENIED; adopting the Report and Recommendations on Petitioner's claim for violation of due process with resepect to the A Z Court of Appeal's refusal to remand to the trial court; withholding ruling on the remainder of the Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation pending determination of Petitioner's 41 Motion to Stay Habeas Corpus Proceedings Pendi ng Appeal; granting Respondent's pending 43 Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response to Petitioner's 40 Objections; Respondents to file a response to Petitioner's Motion to Stay no later than 10/14/08. Petitioner's 36 Motion for a Procedural Order is GRANTED. The Court requests that the AZ Dept. of Corrections allow Petitioner to use his personal typewriter to prepare documents with respect to this litigation. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 09/15/08. (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haskins v. Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.

Why Is My Information Online?