Skydive Arizona, Inc. vs. Quattrochi, et al.

Case Number: 2:2005cv02656
Filed: August 26, 2005
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 11, 2011 540 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiff's 526 Motion to issue writ to recover property, pierce the corporate veil of certain entities, and appoint receiver. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 05/11/11. (ESL)
May 2, 2011 539 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Plaintiff's 529 motion to certify the Final Judgment entered in this case on 04/16/10 (Doc. 447) for registration in the district courts for the following states: Pennsylvania, Alabama, Tennessee, New Jersey, Texas, California, Illinois, and Indiana; THAT THE CLERK OF THE COURT shall prepare and execute the following: An original of the form AO451 for each district court in which the judgment is to be registered; and An original Exemplification Certificate of the Final Judgment for each district court in which the judgment is to be registered. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 05/02/11. (ESL)
March 22, 2011 531 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting Plaintiff attorneys fees in the amount of$1,063,555.00. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case to another District Judge. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/21/11. (SAT)
July 30, 2010 505 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 465 Motion to Require Defendants to Perform Renewal Requirements to Effectuate Transfer of Domain Name. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants will be found in contempt of court and fined $10,000 if they have failed, within two weeks from the date of this Order, to transfer <arizonaskydive.com> to Plaintiff.Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/28/10.(KSP)
June 18, 2010 469 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 451 Motion to Stay; granting 453 Motion for Order Certifying Judgment for Registration in Northern District of Georgia for Good Cause Shown Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1963; FURTHER ORDERED certifying the final judgment in this case for registration in the Northern District of Georgia. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/17/10.(LAD)
April 29, 2010 448 Opinion or Order of the Court PERMANENT INJUNCTION Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 04/26/10. (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details)(ESL)
March 31, 2010 423 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 371 plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is directed to file a memorandum in support of its fees request within 60 days of the entry of judgment. Denying 376 Defendants' Motion to Reduce Jury Verdict.Denying [3 95] Defendants' Motion for Judgement not Withstanding the Verdict, Accounting, Remittitur, or in the Alternative, a New Trial. Granting in part and denying in part 396 Plaintiff's Motion for an Award of Increased Damages and Profits. The Court grants Plaintiff's request for an award of increased damages, but denies Plaintiff's request for an award of increased Profits. Directing the Clerk of the Court to enter judgement accordingly. The judgment should reflect the Jury' ;s verdict, but make the following changes and additions. Awarding Plaintiff $2,500,004 in profits on its Lanham Act § 43 (a) claim (false advertising); doubling the jury's award of $2,500,000 in actual damages on Plaintiff's Lanham Act § 32 claim (trademark infringement) to $5,000,000; and doubling the jury's award of $1,000,000 on its Lanham Act § 43(a) claim to $2,000,000. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/31/10.(DMT)
August 13, 2009 318 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 289 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/12/09.(KSP)
February 5, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Settlement Conference set for 3/3/2008 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns. Each party shall provide the Court with the original of the party's Settlement Conference Memorandum, at least 5 days before the Settlement Conference, the Settlement Conference Memoranda shall NOT be filed with the Clerk. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle H Burns on 2/4/08. (LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Skydive Arizona, Inc. vs. Quattrochi, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?