Seaboard Surety Company v. Grupo Mexico S.A. de C.V.

Case Number: 2:2006cv00134
Filed: January 6, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 25, 2010 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 152 Motion for Attorney Fees; denying 160 Motion Court Ordered Mediation of Claim of Defendant for Attorney Fees (see order details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/25/2010.(TCA)
December 15, 2009 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Grupo Mxico's 136 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Seaboard Surety's 133 Second Amended Complaint is dismissed with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk to enter judgment dismissing this action with prejudice for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. The Clerk shall terminate this case. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/14/09. (SAT)
February 12, 2009 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 139 Stipulation: The deadline for Dft Grupo Mexico to reply in support of its motion to dismiss pla Seaboard's 2nd amended complaint is extended to 2/27/09. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/12/2009. (LAD)
December 23, 2008 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING the parties' 134 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for Dft Grupo Mexico S.A. de C.V. to respond to Pla Seaboard Surety Company's Second Amended Complaint is extended to 1/23/2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/22/08. (SAT)
October 29, 2008 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Status Conference is set for 11/24/2008 02:30 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/28/08. (KMG)
October 16, 2008 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO UNSEAL; it is ordered unsealing the order 128 filed in this action on 9/30/08; the Clerk shall unseal the order 128 filed under seal in this action on 9/30/08. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/14/08. (REW, )
September 30, 2008 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 86 Motion FURTHER ORDERED denying without prejudice 95 Motion FURTHER ORDERED denying 119 Motion. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/29/08. (cc: All Cnsl)(MAP) Modified on 10/16/2008 unsealed (REW, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Seaboard Surety Company v. Grupo Mexico S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?