Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Autozone, Inc.

Case Number: 2:2006cv00926
Filed: March 30, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 7, 2009 262 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff Equal Employment Opportunity Commission may file a response to Defendants motion for reconsideration by December 18,2009. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant has until December 31, 2009 to file a reply to Plaintiffs response, if it so desires. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/4/2009. (TCA, )
November 9, 2009 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 232 Motion to Amend Judgment to Add Equitable Relief. (See Order for Details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/9/2009.(TCA, )
May 29, 2009 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 173 At the Final Pre-Trial Conference held on May 26, 2009, the Court agreed to address and rule on the parties' objections to the designated testimony of Howard Brown prior to trial. Mr. Brown will appear via videotape deposition and the advance ruling will allow the parties to edit the videotape of the deposition. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/28/09. (Note: See Order for full details)(KMG)
April 8, 2009 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by Friday, 5/1/09, the parties shall submit a stipulation regarding the lost records to the Court, or alternatively, designate one witness to testify regarding Dft's record keeping and retention policies. FURTHE R ORDERED that should Pla wish to use additional witnesses' testimony in objection, Pla must provide the Court with the reasons why such testimony is necessary and how it differs from the testimony of the witness designated by the parties by Friday, 5/1/09. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/8/09. (SAT)
March 9, 2009 151 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED GRANTING the 150 Motion to Withdraw Counsel for Plaintiff EEOC. FURTHER ORDERED that attorney Katherine K. Kruse is withdrawn as counsel in the present case. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/9/09.(SAT)
March 5, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING the Motion for Withdrawal of Co-Counsel Katherine K. Kruse 148 without prejudice with leave to refile. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/4/09.(KMG)
February 5, 2009 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 146 Joint Motion (1) for Ruling on Deposition Designation Objections without Video; or (2) For Leave To Submit Videos In Unedited Form. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/4/09.(REW, )
January 15, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 144 Motion for Clarification and Incorporated Memorandum. In an effort to clarify its prior ruling, the Court finds that evidence of dft's net worth is potentially relevant to the amount of punitive damages in this case and as a result, such evidence is admissible. Once the Court determines there is sufficient evidence to submit the issue of punitive damages to the jury, such evidence will be admitted subject to a limiting instruction. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/15/2009. (LAD)
January 13, 2009 143 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 127 Motion in Limine. FURTHER ORDERED that a jury trial is set for 6/2/09 at 9:00 a.m. before the Honorable Stephen M. McNamee. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/12/2009. (LAD)
January 7, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot Plaintiff's 140 Unopposed Motion to Excuse David Lopez from Attendance at the Pretrial Conference. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/7/09.(REW, )
December 9, 2008 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part Dft's 118 Motion to Extend Deadline for Dft to Submit Objections to Pla's Deposition Designations. FURTHER ORDERED the deadline for filing the proposed pretrial order is extended to Wednesday, 12/17/08. The proposed pretrial order shall include objections to deposition testimony as well as the bases for the objections. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/8/2008.(LAD)
October 28, 2008 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re: FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE, Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2009 04:00 PM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 12/12/2008 (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/28/08. (REW, )
September 11, 2008 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Dft's 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying EEOC's 103 Response in Opposition to Motion/Request for an adverse inference; denying as moot EEOC's 108 Motion to Strike; denying as moot EEOC's 112 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 09/10/08.(DNH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Equal Employment Opportunity Commission v. Autozone, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?