Delta Mechanical, Inc. v. Garden City Group, Inc. et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv01095
Filed: April 19, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2015 164 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL ORDER AND OPINION. Defendants' motion for summary judgment 152 is granted in part and denied in part as follows: Plaintiff's claim for breach of the covenant of good faith and fair dealing is dismissed. Plaintiff's claim for br each of contract survives because there appears to be a genuine issue of fact as to whether defendants impliedly waived the requirement that a class member receive a certificate before obtaining repair services. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/6/15. (REW)
March 2, 2015 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER [PRELIMINARY] re: 152 MOTION for Summary Judgment. This order does NOT decide the motion at docket 152. Rather, this order is intended to assist counsel in preparing for oral argument. It sets forth the court's preliminary views. It does not authorize the filing of any additional motion papers. Following oral argument, the court may adopt this order in whole or in part in its disposition of the motion. See PDF for full content. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/2/15. (JWS)
January 12, 2012 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND OPINION granting 125 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 127 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. The Clerk shall please enter judgment for defendants. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 1/11/12.(LAD)
March 16, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 99 Motion for Discovery and 102 Motion to Withdraw. Defendants' motion at docket 99 is DENIED as moot. Delta's motion at docket 102 to withdraw its admissions to requests 8 through 12 and 17 is GRANTED. Defendants' request for fees is DENIED, and defendants' request to extend deadlines is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 3/15/11.(JWS)
June 28, 2010 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 82 Motion to Quash; denying 83 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge John W Sedwick on 6/28/10.(JWS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delta Mechanical, Inc. v. Garden City Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?