Mullins v. Schriro et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv01148
Filed: April 24, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Referring Judge: Lawrence O Anderson
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2008 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 98 . That attorney Joy Bertrand is discharged and terminated as counsel for Petitioner. That the Clerk of the Court enter judgment dismissing petitioner's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 1 ) with prejudice. The Clerk shall terminate this action. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/22/08. (DMT, )
September 4, 2008 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION granting Motion 95 to Withdraw his Notice of Change of Counsel and the Clerk of Court shall terminate Petitioners Notice of Change of Counsel 80 . FURTHER ORDERED denying Motion to Seal her Response to Petition ers Notice of Change of Counsel, in view of the discussion of this issue in open court during the 9/3/08 hearing. HEREBY RECOMMENDING that the Court accept findings that Petitioner knowingly, voluntarily, and intelligently withdraws the following cla im asserted in his Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus: that Kenneth Huls was ineffective for failing to advise Petitioner of the potential sentence he faced if he rejected a plea offer and proceeded to trial, and that the Court grant Petitioners Motion to Withdraw Ground Two of Petition for Habeas Corpus Relief 94 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/4/08. (MAP)
September 3, 2008 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Utah State Prison, through its employees, Sgt. Dan Jorgensen and/or Sgt. Spencer Turley shall make the necessary arrangements to produce inmate Clayton Mullins and place the call to the aforesaid phone number on Wedensday, September 3, 2008, promptly at 2:00 p.m. Arizona time. Directing the undersigneds staff to fax a copy of this Order to Sgt. Dan Jorgensen and Sgt. Spencer Turley to fax number (801) 576- 4028. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/2/08. (DMT, )
September 2, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Robert Stewart, Warden of the Arizona State Prison Complex in Florence, Arizona, Cook Unit- Eyman, through its employee, CO III Richard McGraugh make the necessary arrangements for Petitioner Isaac J. W. Mullins, Inmate #158541, to receive the Court's call promptly at 2:00 pm for the telephonic Evidentiary Hearing set for 9/3/2008 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson at the phone number set forth in this order. Directing the undersigneds staff to fax a copy of this Order to Warden Robert Stewart at the Main Fax number of (520) 868-5333 and to CO III Richard McGraughs fax number at (520) 868-8527 to the attention of D. W. Bock.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 9/2/08. (DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mullins v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?