Cafasso v. General Dynamics C4 Systems, et al.,

Case Number: 2:2006cv01381
Filed: May 26, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 31:3729 False Claims Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 22, 2011 446 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant-Counterclaimant-Appellee's Request for Attorneys' Fees, filed as docket entry 75-1, in No. 09-16181, United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, and transferred to this Court (Doc. 442) is granted under A.R.S. § 12-341.01(A) in the amount of $64,849.50. It is further ordered that the Clerk enter judgment in favor of General Dynamics C4 Systems, Inc., against Mary A. Cafasso in the amount of $64,849.50 for attorney fees pursuant to A.R.S. § 12-341.01(A). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 06/21/11. (ESL)
January 29, 2010 436 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 423 Motion to Stay 11/4/09 Order Pending Appeal and 425 Motion to Waive Rule 62(d) Bond Requirement and Grant Stay of Judgment Pending Appeal. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 1/29/10.(MAP)
November 4, 2009 419 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW and ORDER that Defendant GDC4S's Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees 363 is granted in part and denied in part. The motion for award of fees against Relator's counsel under 28:1927 and the cour t's inherent power is denied. The motion for award of fees against Relator Mary A. Cafasso under A.R.S. 12-341-01(A) is granted in the amount of $300,000.00. ORDER that Defendant GDC4S's Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Bill of Costs re State Court 385 is granted. The Clerk is directed to file Defendant GDC4S's Lodged [Proposed] Supplemental Bill of Costs 386 . ORDER that the Clerk enter judgment in favor of General Dynamics C4 Systems, Inc., against Mary A. Cafasso in the amount of $300,000.00 for attorney fees pursuant to A.R.S. 12-341.01(A). Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 11/3/09. (TLJ)
May 21, 2009 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Relator's 275 Motion for Summary Judgment on Defendant's Counterclaims; granting GDC4S's 272 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment on: (1) Count II of Relator's Substitute Amended Complaint (Retaliation) and (2) Co unt I of GDC4S's Counterclaim (Breach of Contract); Counts II through VI of GDC4S's Counterclaim are dismissed without prejudice on motion of GDC4S, but without leave to refile them in this or any other action. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 5/21/09.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cafasso v. General Dynamics C4 Systems, et al.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?