Jamieson v. Slater et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv01524
Filed: June 13, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2010 219 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 213 Motion for Clarification. Counts One, Two, and Three of Kathy Jamiesons Amended Complaint (Doc.12) are dismissed against Defendants Lawrence B. Slater, Sandra G. Slater, and Slater&Associates, P.C.FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Lawrence B. Slater, Sandra G. Slater,and Slater & Associates, P.C. are dismissed from this case.(see order details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/21/2010.(TCA)
April 29, 2010 207 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Kathy Jamieson's 184 Motion for Reconsideration re: Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment as to Claims of Monica Jagelski. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 04/29/10.(ESL)
April 20, 2010 206 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Marchant's 205 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/19/10.(KMG)
January 5, 2010 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall file a joint status report informing the Court of the result of the 12/22/09 mediation and whether a settlement was reached. This status report shall be filed no later than Friday, 1/15/10. Status Report due by 1/15/2010. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/4/2010. (LAD)
October 29, 2009 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Parties 194 Motion for a Status Conference. A Status Conference is set for 11/30/2009 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Stephen M McNamee. It is further ordered that Kathy J amieson may appear telephonically in light of her Texas residence and in pro per status. Kathy Jamieson shall telephone Judge McNamee's Chambers no later than 2:55p.m. on 11/30/09. If Kathy Jamieson secures new counsel prior to the status conference, counsel shall appear in person at the status conference. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/29/09.(ESL)
October 14, 2009 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 188 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ORDER that Richard R. Thomas is hereby withdrawn as counsel of record for Kathy L. Jamieson and Kassie Kientz. ORDER directing the Clerk of the Court to send a copy of this Order as well as all future communications directly to Kathy L. Jamieson and Kassie Kientz at the following last known address: Kathy L. Jamieson, 3440 N. Old Smithville Road, Muldoon, TX 78949 Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/13/09.(TLJ)
September 8, 2009 175 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER that Dfts' 133 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is granted. It is further ordered that Count I alleging a violation of A.R.S. § 33-420 is dismissed against Defendants Lawrence B. Slater, Jane Doe Slater, and Lawrence Slater & Associates P.C.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 09/04/09.(ESL, )
August 14, 2009 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the Joint 170 Motion for Extension of Time. FURTHER ORDERED that the date for all responses to the pending motions for summary judgment (including the supplemental motion for summary judgment) shall be extended to September 4, 2009. FURTHER ORDERED that the date for all replies in support of the pending motions for summary judgment shall be extended to September 25, 2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 8/13/09.(KMG, )
April 8, 2009 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING the 149 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Reply to Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the date for Dft Slater to file his Reply is extended to 4/13/09. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/7/09. (SAT)
March 31, 2009 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING the 143 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Jgm. FURTHER ORDERED that the date for Pla Kathy Jamieson to file her Response is extended to 4/1/09. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/30/09. (SAT)
March 27, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 141 Joint Stipulation to Extend Time to File Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that the date for Plaintiff Kathy Jamieson to file her Response is extended to 3/30/09. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/27/09. (MAP)
December 31, 2008 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING the 127 Motion to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. FURTHER ORDERED that all dates set in the Court's Orders of 3/27/08 (Doc. 108) and 8/1/08 (Doc. 124), and any deadlines set thereafter w ill be extended by this Order to include the following: 1. All discovery, including depositions of parties, witnesses, and experts, answers to interrogatories, and supplements to interrogatories must be completed by Friday, 5/1/09; 2. All dispositive motions shall be filed no later than Friday, 6/26/09; and 3. All other dates set as "TBA" (Docs. 80 and 124) will continue to be open for future determination by this Court. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/31/08. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamieson v. Slater et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?