Best Western International, Inc v. Doe et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv01537
Filed: June 14, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 2, 2008 522 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 485 Motion in Limine; denying 486 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/2/2008.(NVJ)
November 26, 2008 520 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 479 Motion in Limine; denying 480 Motion in Limine; denying 481 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 482 Motion in Limine; denying 483 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 485 Motion in Limine; taking under advisement 486 Motion in Limine; denying 489 Motion in Limine; granting 490 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 494 Motion in Limine. Trial is set to being 3/9/2009 at 9:00 a.m. Final conference set for 3/5/2009 at 4:30 p.m. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/26/2008.(NVJ, )
October 20, 2008 477 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 426 Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; denying 427 Motion in Limine; denying 428 Motion ; denying 437 Motion in Limine; denying 438 Motion in Limine; denying 440 Motion in Limine; denying 442 Motion in Limine; denying 443 Motion in Limine; denying 444 Motion in Limine; denying 445 Motion in Limine; denying 446 Motion in Limine; denying 447 Motion in Limine; denying 448 Motion in Limine; denying 449 Motion in Limine; denying 450 Motion in Limine; denying 451 Motion in Limine; denying 452 Motion in Limine; denying 453 Motion in Limine; denying 454 Motion in Limine; denying 455 Motion in Limine; denying 455 Motion to Intervene; denying 456 Motion in Limine; denying 457 Motion in Limine; denying 458 Motion in Limine; denying 459 Motion in Limine; denying 460 Motion in Limine; denying 461 Motion in Limine; denying 462 Motion in Limine; denying 465 Motion in Limine; denying 466 Motion in Limine; denying 467 Motion in L imine; denying 469 Motion in Limine; denying 470 Motion in Limine; denying 471 Motion in Limine. Final pretrial conference set for 11/5/2008 at 4:30 p.m. is VACATED and RESET to 11/21/2008 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/20/2008. (NVJ)
September 5, 2008 414 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 399 Motion to Strike; granting in part and denying in part 338 Motion for Summary Judgment. Final Pretrial Conference will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/5/2008.(NVJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Best Western International, Inc v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?