Soilworks LLC v Midwest Industrial Supply Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff Soilworks, LLC alleged that Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc. violated the Lanham Act, the Arizona Deceptive Trade Practices Act and Arizona common law by disparaging Plaintiff and its products and falsely representing that Plaintiff is infringing patent rights of Defendant.

Plaintiff: Soilworks LLC
Defendant: Midwest Industrial Supply Inc
Counter Claimant: Midwest Industrial Supply Inc and Soilworks LLC
Counter Defendant: Soilworks LLC and Midwest Industrial Supply Inc
Case Number: 2:2006cv02141
Filed: September 7, 2006
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER Any and all claims of any sort that were raised in the instant action, by any and/or all parties in this action, are dismissed with prejudice. Pla Soilworks, LLC and Dft Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc. further stipulate to the entry of this Order by the Court dismissing this action in its entirety, with prejudice. Each party shall bear its own costs and attys' fees. The Clerk is directed to terminate this matter. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 04/16/09. (ESL)
April 6, 2009 Filing 165 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Wade, Anastasia)
March 27, 2009 Filing 164 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Johnathan Lee Riches. Reason for return: Return to Sender. Not Deliverable as addressed. Unable to Forward. Document number 160. (HLA)
March 16, 2009 Filing 163 SEALED Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell on 3/16/2009. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) (cc: Dosek/Marvinney/CD)(MAP)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER. The parties have informed the Court that they have reached a final and binding settlement of this action. They have agreed that the settlement documentation will be completed and a stipulated dismissal filed on or before the close of business on April 6, 2009. If issues arise during the documentation of the settlement, the parties agree that the Court will have the authority to resolve those issues and enforce the settlement, and that in no event will a jury trial be required in this case. On the basis of this binding settlement agreement, the Court will vacate the trial scheduled to begin tomorrow. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3-16-09. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
March 16, 2009 Filing 161 Sealed Exhibit re 154 filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (MAP)
March 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting 156 Motion to File Exhibit Under Seal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/13/09.(MAP)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER denying 153 Motion to Supplement. Soilworks has not satisfied the very demanding "manifest injustice" standard established by the Court's Order Setting Trial and by Rule 16(e) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. The materials submitted by Midwest (Dkt. #154) show that Soilworks was aware during the course of discovery that Midwest claimed that Durasoil infringed because it contained a synthetic isoalkane and a binder consisting of a carboxylic acid, an ester, or a thermoplastic polyolefin. To the extent Midwest's claims were somewhat imprecise (as the Court recognized at the final pretrial conference), Soilworks had the power to invoke the Court's assistance and require Midwest to clarify its discovery responses. Soilworks never did so. Because Soilworks could have identified the need for and produced the proposed expert witness in accordance with the Court's discovery schedule, the Court will not allow Soilworks to do so on the eve of trial. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3-13-09. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
March 12, 2009 Filing 159 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: E. Scott Dosek and John Passarelli (telephonically) for pla; Craig Marvinney (telephonically), Donald Myles, Jr. and John Skeriotis (telephonically) for dft. Final Pretrial Conference held on 3/12/2009. Pending motions ruled on as stated on the record. IT IS ORDERED affirming jury trial set for 3/17/2009 at 9:00 a.m.; 8:30 a.m. for counsel. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, )
March 11, 2009 Filing 157 SEALED LODGED Proposed Deposition of Chad Falkenberg (Exhibit F) re: 156 MOTION to Seal Document re Deposition of Chad Falkenberg in Support of Opposition to Soilworks, LLC's Untimely Winess and Report. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Wade, Anastasia)
March 11, 2009 Filing 156 MOTION to Seal Document re Deposition of Chad Falkenberg in Support of Opposition to Soilworks, LLC's Untimely Winess and Report by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wade, Anastasia)
March 11, 2009 Filing 155 SUPPLEMENT of Soilworks LLC's Supplement to the Parties' Proposed Final Pretrial Order (Dkt. #116) re 116 Notice of Filing Proposed Pretrial Order by Plaintiff Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
March 11, 2009 Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re 153 MOTION to Supplement to Add Exhibit and Witness to Final Pretrial Order and Motion in Limine to Prevent Evidence and Testimony of the Same filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- Claims Chart for '266 Patent, # 2 Exhibit B - Claims Chart for '270 Patent, # 3 Exhibit C - Midwest's Answer to Soilworks' Second Set of Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit D - Deposition of Robert Vitale and Exhibits, # 5 Exhibit E - Transcript of Final Pretrial Conference, # 6 Exhibit G - Expert Report of Dr. Funk)(Wade, Anastasia)
February 25, 2009 Filing 153 MOTION to Supplement to Add Exhibit and Witness to Final Pretrial Order by Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1: Report of Analysis, # 2 Exhibit 2: Midwest's Infringement Claim Timeline, # 3 Exhibit 3: Pretrial Hearing Transcript of 10/9/08, # 4 Exhibit 4: Hawkins Deposition Transcript, # 5 Exhibit 5: Vitale 30(b)(6) Deposition Transcript, # 6 Exhibit 6: Detloff Deposition Transcript)(Dosek, E)
February 20, 2009 Filing 152 OBJECTION to Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc.'s Supplemental Proposed Jury Instruction filed by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
January 31, 2009 Filing 151 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
January 30, 2009 Filing 150 NOTICE TO PARTY OF DEFICIENCY RE CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 15 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set for 2/17/2009 as to Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (LMR)
January 20, 2009 Filing 149 SUPPLEMENT of Proposed Jury Instructions re 118 Proposed Jury Instructions by Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Wade, Anastasia)
January 9, 2009 Filing 148 Proposed Verdict Form by Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
January 9, 2009 Filing 147 Proposed Jury Instructions by Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Dosek, E)
January 9, 2009 Filing 146 MEMORANDUM re: Soilworks' Pretrial Memorandum by Plaintiff Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Report of Analysis)(Dosek, E)
January 9, 2009 Filing 145 Proposed Verdict Form by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
January 9, 2009 Filing 144 MEMORANDUM re: Court's October 16, 2008 Order by Counter Claimant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Counter Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Registration for U.S. Patent No. 7,074,266, # 2 Exhibit B - Registration for U.S. Patent No. 7,081,270, # 3 Exhibit C - Claim Construction Chart for U.S. Patent No. 7,074,266, # 4 Exhibit D - Claim Construction Chart for U.S. Patent No. 7,081,270, # 5 Exhibit E - Recent Trademark Cases)(Skeriotis, John)
November 25, 2008 Filing 143 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: John Passarelli for pla; E. Scott Dosek, Craig Marvinney and John Skeriotis for dfts. Telephone Conference held on 11/25/2008. Jury Trial reset for 3/17/2009 at 09:00 AM, 08:30 AM for counsel, for 4 days before Judge David G Campbell. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 3/12/2009 at 04:30 PM before Judge David G Campbell. Out of state counsel may appear by telephone for the final pretrial conference.(Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, )
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER. The order at Docket Entry 141 was entered in error in this case and should be disregarded. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11-25-08. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
November 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER. The Court held a discovery conference call with the parties. Plaintiff seeks to inquire in deposition into investigations of race discrimination in offices other than Defendant's Chandler, Arizona office. The Court concludes that such discovery is overly broad. The issue in this case is whether management in the Chandler office discriminated against Plaintiff on the basis of race when they withdrew his job offer. Plaintiff may inquire into other allegations of race discrimination in the Chandler office, but may not extend his inquiry to offices elsewhere in the United States that had nothing to do with the withdrawal of his job offer. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11-25-08. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DGC)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 11/25/2008 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Counsel for Plaintiff will set up the call to defense counsel and the court. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/24/2008. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVJ)
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 138 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 24, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX077049 as to Anastasia Wade. (BAS, )
October 23, 2008 Filing 138 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Anastasia Wade on behalf of Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (BAS, )
October 22, 2008 Filing 137 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (BAS, )
October 22, 2008 Filing 136 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/9/08 before Judge David G Campbell. Court Reporters: Gary Moll and Patricia Lyons. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/12/2008. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2008. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2009. (BAS, )
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER re additional briefing due 1/9/2009. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/16/2008. (NVJ)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER granting 101 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 102 Motion in Limine; granting 103 Motion in Limine; granting 104 Motion in Limine; denying 105 Motion in Limine; granting 106 Motion in Limine; granting 107 Motion in Limine; denying 108 Motion in Limine; denying 109 Motion in Limine; denying 110 Motion in Limine. Trial in this matter will begin on 1/20/2009 at 8:30 a.m.; final conference will be held on 1/15/2009 at 4:00 pm. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/16/2008.(NVJ, )
October 13, 2008 Filing 133 Transcript Order Form for October 9, 2008 Pretrial Hearing Transcript by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Marvinney, Craig) Modified on 10/14/2008 (LAD). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM NOTICE TO TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM.
October 10, 2008 Filing 131 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION AND ORDER FORM by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC for proceedings held on 10/09/08 before Judge David G. Campbell. (Dosek, E)
October 9, 2008 Filing 132 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: E. Scott Dosek and John Passarelli for pla; Craig Marvinney, Donald Myles and John Skeriotis for dft. Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/9/2008. Pending motions ruled on as stated on the record. Trial set for 1/20/2009 at 9:00 a.m. for 4 days. A jury of 8 will be seated. Final pretrial conference set for 1/15/2009 at 4:30 p.m. Separate order to issue. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, )
October 9, 2008 Filing 130 Additional Attachments to Main Document (NDA - Notice of Docket Activity) re 129 Mandate of 9th Circuit. (KMG, )
October 9, 2008 Filing 129 MANDATE of 9th Circuit (Certified Copy), because the appeals are so insubstantial as to not warrant further review, they shall not be permitted to proceed. A copy of this order served on the district court for the District of Arizona shall constitute the mandate of this court. No motions for reconsideration, rehearing, clarification, stay of the mandate, or any other submissions shall be filed or entertained in this closed docket. Case number 08-80044, as to 99 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory filed by Jonathan Lee Riches (KMG, )
September 24, 2008 Filing 128 RESPONSE in Opposition re 110 MOTION in Limine re: Bar Evidence Regarding Innocent Trademark Infringement of the Mark SOIL-SEMENT filed filed by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Dosek, E)
September 24, 2008 Filing 127 RESPONSE in Opposition re 104 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony and Evidence Offered by Soilworks regarding the Validity or Construction of Midwest's Patents filed by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Dosek, E)
September 24, 2008 Filing 126 RESPONSE to Motion re 107 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony and Evidence of Liability Insurance filed by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
September 24, 2008 Filing 125 RESPONSE in Opposition re 106 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony and Evidence regarding the Composition of Durasoil and Soilworks' Other Products filed by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
September 24, 2008 Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re 105 MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence regarding Any Legal Advice Soilworks may have Received Concerning Midwest's Patents filed by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
September 24, 2008 Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re 103 MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence Concerning Soilworks' Costs filed by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
September 24, 2008 Filing 122 RESPONSE in Opposition re 102 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Offered by Soilworks by Soilworks related to Certain Elements of Soilworks' False Advertising Claim filed by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
September 24, 2008 Filing 121 RESPONSE in Opposition re 101 MOTION in Limine to Limit Soilworks, LLC's Evidence of Midwest's Alleged False Advertising to the Four Documents Produced by Soilworks during Discovery filed by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
September 24, 2008 Filing 120 RESPONSE in Opposition re 109 MOTION in Limine re: To Exclude Evidence of its Sales of Soiltac and Gorilla Snot filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
September 24, 2008 Filing 119 RESPONSE in Opposition re 108 MOTION in Limine re: To Exclude Evidence of its Sales of Durasoil filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
September 19, 2008 Filing 118 Proposed Jury Instructions by Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Dosek, E)
September 19, 2008 Filing 117 Exhibit List of Soilworks LLC and Midwest Industrial Supply by Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc.. (Dosek, E)
September 19, 2008 Filing 116 Notice of Filing Proposed Pretrial Order filed by Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Dosek, E)
September 19, 2008 Filing 115 Proposed Verdict Form by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
September 19, 2008 Filing 114 Proposed Voir Dire by Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Dosek, E)
September 19, 2008 Filing 113 Proposed Verdict Form by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Bautista, Jill)
September 19, 2008 Filing 112 Proposed Findings of Fact by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Bautista, Jill)
September 19, 2008 Filing 111 Notice re Stipulated Description of the Case by Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Dosek, E)
September 17, 2008 Filing 110 MOTION in Limine re: Bar Evidence Regarding Innocent Trademark Infringement of the Mark SOIL-SEMENT filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
September 17, 2008 Filing 109 MOTION in Limine re: To Exclude Evidence of its Sales of Soiltac and Gorilla Snot by Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Dosek, E)
September 17, 2008 Filing 108 MOTION in Limine re: To Exclude Evidence of its Sales of Durasoil by Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Dosek, E)
September 17, 2008 Filing 107 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony and Evidence of Liability Insurance by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Bautista, Jill)
September 17, 2008 Filing 106 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony and Evidence regarding the Composition of Durasoil and Soilworks' Other Products by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Bautista, Jill)
September 17, 2008 Filing 105 MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence regarding Any Legal Advice Soilworks may have Received Concerning Midwest's Patents by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Soilworks' Responses to Midwest's First Set of Interrogatories, # 2 Exhibit B - Soilworks' Responses to Midwest's Document Production Requests)(Bautista, Jill)
September 17, 2008 Filing 104 MOTION in Limine to Bar Testimony and Evidence Offered by Soilworks regarding the Validity or Construction of Midwest's Patents by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Soilworks' Response to Midwest's First Set of Interrogatories))(Bautista, Jill)
September 17, 2008 Filing 103 MOTION in Limine to Bar Evidence Concerning Soilworks' Costs by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit (Soilworks' Responses to Midwest's Document Production Requests))(Bautista, Jill)
September 17, 2008 Filing 102 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Testimony and Evidence Offered by Soilworks by Soilworks related to Certain Elements of Soilworks' False Advertising Claim by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A, B, C, D)(Bautista, Jill)
September 17, 2008 Filing 101 MOTION in Limine to Limit Soilworks, LLC's Evidence of Midwest's Alleged False Advertising to the Four Documents Produced by Soilworks during Discovery by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Soilworks' Responses to Midwest's Document Production Requests)(Bautista, Jill)
September 9, 2008 Filing 100 Notice of Appeal Notification Form; Notice of Appeal and copy of docket sheet transmitted to Ninth Circuit and all parties re 99 Notice of Appeal - Interlocutory. (TLJ)
September 5, 2008 Filing 99 NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to the United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit by Jonathan Lee Riches (not a party to this case). (Motion to Intervene was never filed) (TLJ)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER granting 97 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/5/2008.(NVJ)
August 19, 2008 Filing 97 MOTION to Amend/Correct re Clarification of August 7, 2008 Order by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Clarifying August 7, 2008 Order)(Skeriotis, John)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2008 at 4:00 PM is VACATED and RESET to 10/9/2008 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. All other deadlines contained in 95 order setting final pretrial conference remain in effect. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/18/2008. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (NVJ)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER re Final Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2008 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Motions in limine due by 9/17/2008; responses due 9/24/2008; no replies permitted. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/17/2008. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/7/2008. (NVJ)
August 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 78 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. A final pretrial conference will be set by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/7/2008.(NVJ)
August 1, 2008 Filing 93 RETURN OF SERVICE of Subpoena in a Civil Case served on Deponent: Todd Hawkins on 7/29/2008, filed by Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
June 30, 2008 Filing 92 REPLY to Response to Motion re 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Dosek, E)
June 30, 2008 Filing 91 REPLY in Support re 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
June 12, 2008 Filing 90 SUPPLEMENT of Plaintiff's Response and Objections to Midwest's Statement of Facts in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re 80 Statement,,,,,,,, by Plaintiff Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
June 12, 2008 Filing 89 RESPONSE in Opposition re 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Google search "Soiltac", # 2 Exhibit 2 Google search "soilworks", # 3 Exhibit 3 Portions of C. Falkenberg Depo, # 4 Exhibit 4 Dictionary meaning of Synthetic, # 5 Exhibit 5 Declaration of C. Falkenberg, # 6 Exhibit 6 Passarelli letter dated July 18, 2006)(Dosek, E)
June 11, 2008 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re 79 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Soilworks, LLC filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Responsive Statement of Facts, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Excerpts from Vitale Deposition Vol II, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Excerpts from Vitale Deposition Vol. I, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Excerpts from Keven Hurst Deposition, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit D(1) - Excerpts from Chad Falkenberg Deposition Vol. I, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit D(2) - Excerpts from Chad Falkenberg Deposition Vol. I (w/Exhibits 8 and 41), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit E - Soilworks' Expert Disclosure, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit F - Declaration of Robert Vitale, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit G - Excerpts of Steve Hickman Deposition, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit H - Excerpts of Steve Gordner Deposition)(Skeriotis, John)
May 27, 2008 Filing 87 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Soilworks LLC Affidavit of Service of Subpoena upon Martin L. Koether, Jr. (Dosek, E)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER denying 67 Motion for order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/22/2008.(NVJ)
May 22, 2008 Filing 85 SEALED STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS re 78 filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: #(1) Exhibit)(MAP)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 84 SEALED ORDER granting 81 Motion. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/16/08. (cc: All Cnsl)(MAP)
May 13, 2008 Filing 82 SEALED LODGED Proposed Midwest's Sealed Statement of Facts re: 81 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Midwest's Statement of Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. Filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Excerpts of Transcript of Chad Falkenberg Deposition)(Grinham, Jill)
May 13, 2008 Filing 81 SEALED MOTION to Seal Document re Midwest's Statement of Material Facts in Support of Its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Midwest's May 9, 2008 Motion to File Submitted Documents under Seal)(Grinham, Jill)
May 12, 2008 Filing 83 SEALED EXHIBITS re 79 filed by Soilworks LLC. (MAP)
May 9, 2008 Filing 80 STATEMENT of Material Facts by Counter Claimant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Counter Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit List to Midwest's Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Exhibit A - Deposition of Robert Vitale (I), # 3 Exhibit B - Deposition of Robert Vitale (II), # 4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Robert Vitale, # 5 Vitale Declaration (Attachment 1), # 6 Vitale Declaration (Attachment 2), # 7 Vitale Declaration (Attachment 3), # 8 Vitale Declaration (Attachment 4), # 9 Vitale Declaration (Attachment 5), # 10 Vitale Declaration (Attachment 6), # 11 Vitale Declaration (Attachment 7), # 12 Vitale Declaration (Attachment 9), # 13 Vitale Declaration (Attachment 9), # 14 Vitale Declaration (Attachment 10), # 15 Exhibit C - Deposition of Chad Falkenberg, # 16 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 12), # 17 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 44), # 18 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 45), # 19 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 48), # 20 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 49), # 21 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 49), # 22 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 53), # 23 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 54), # 24 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 55), # 25 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 56), # 26 Chad Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 57), # 27 Exhibit E - Dorian Falkenberg Deposition, # 28 Dorian Falkenberg Deposition (Ex. 13), # 29 Exhibit F - Soilworks' Rule 26 Initial Disclosures, # 30 Exhibit G - Soilworks' Responses, # 31 Exhibit H - Midwest's Interrogatories, # 32 Exhibit I - Midwest's First Document Production Request, # 33 Exhibit J - Midwest's Second Document Production Request, # 34 Exhibit K - Declaration of John Skeriotis, # 35 Skeriotis (Attachment A), # 36 Skeriotis Declaration (Attachment B), # 37 Skeriotis Declaration (Attachment C), # 38 Skeriotis Declaration (Attachment D), # 39 Exhibit I - Soilworks' Responses to First Set of Document Requests, # 40 Exhibit M - Soilworks' Responses to Second Document Requests, # 41 Exhibit N - Steve Hickman Deposition, # 42 Exhibit O - Steve Gordner Deposition)(Grinham, Jill)
May 9, 2008 Filing 79 MEMORANDUM in Support re 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Soilworks LLC, Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Statement of Facts in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-7 to SOF in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 3 Exhibit Exhibits 7-14 to SOF in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment)(Dosek, E) Modified on 5/12/2008 (SAT). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "MOTION" TO "MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF". DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO CORRECT DOCUMENT LINKAGE.
May 9, 2008 Filing 78 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment)(Grinham, Jill)
April 28, 2008 Filing 77 REPLY in Support re 67 MOTION for for Order to Include "Synthetic Organic Dust Control" as part of "Midwest's Marks" filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
April 23, 2008 Filing 76 Notice re Notice of Service by Soilworks LLC re Supplemental Response to Midwest's First Set of Interrogatories (Dosek, E)
April 23, 2008 Filing 75 RETURN OF SERVICE of Subpoena in a Civil Case served on Earthcare Consultants, LLC on 4/18/2008, filed by Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
April 21, 2008 Filing 74 RETURN OF SERVICE of Subpoena served on Ribelin Sales on 4/10/2008, filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Grinham, Jill)
April 21, 2008 Filing 73 RETURN OF SERVICE of Subpoena served on Steve Hickman (Spenard Builders Supply) on 4/10/2008, filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Grinham, Jill)
April 21, 2008 Filing 72 RETURN OF SERVICE of Subpoena served on Steve Gordner (Spenard Builders Supply) on 4/10/2008, filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Grinham, Jill)
April 14, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 70 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 14, 2008 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX070022 as to Craig A Marvinney. (BAS, )
April 14, 2008 Filing 70 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Craig A Marvinney on behalf of Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, and counter-claimant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (BAS, )
April 14, 2008 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re 67 MOTION for for Order to Include "Synthetic Organic Dust Control" as part of "Midwest's Marks" filed by Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
March 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER granting 66 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel. That Bryan Cave LLP and attorneys Lawrence G. Scarborough and George C. Chen shall withdraw as counsel for defendant/counterclaimant Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc., effective upon entry of this Order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/28/08.(MAP)
March 26, 2008 Filing 67 MOTION for for Order to Include "Synthetic Organic Dust Control" as part of "Midwest's Marks" by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Riverdeep Complaint, # 2 Exhibit B: Westlaw Cases, # 3 Exhibit C - Midwest's Answer's to Plaintiff's Second Set of Interrogatories, # 4 Exhibit D: 071130 Midwest's Settlement Letter, # 5 Exhibit E - Midwest's Settlement Conference Memorandum, # 6 Exhibit F - Excerpts from Deposition of Robert Vitale1, # 7 Exhibit G - U.S. Trademark Registration No. 3,318,243, # 8 Text of Proposed Order)(Skeriotis, John)
March 25, 2008 Filing 66 EX PARTE MOTION Ex Parte Application for Leave to Withdraw by Counter Claimant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, George) MODIFIED TO CORRECT DOCKET TEXT FROM EX PARTE DOCUMENT TO EX PARTE MOTION ON 3/28/08 (MAP)
March 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER denying 63 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/18/2008.(NVJ)
March 17, 2008 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald L Myles, Jr on behalf of Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Myles, Donald)
March 14, 2008 Filing 63 MOTION for Reconsideration re Unopposed Request for Reconsideration of the Parties Joint Motion for Extension of Time (ECF Docket No. 59) and Request for Rule 16(a) Scheduling Conference by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
March 7, 2008 Filing 62 Notice re Notice of Service by Soilworks LLC Expert Witness Disclosure (Dosek, E)
March 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER denying 59 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/5/2008.(NVJ)
March 3, 2008 Filing 60 Additional Attachments to Main Document re 59 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend Case Deadlines [Proposed] Order by Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
March 2, 2008 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To Extend Case Deadlines by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
February 27, 2008 Filing 58 Minute Order: Settlement Conference held 2/27/08 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson. Present are E. Scott Dosek and John P. Passarelli, counsel for Plaintiff; Chad Falkenberg, President of Plaintiff Soilworks and Dorian Falkenberg, Vice President of Plaintiff Soilworks. Also present are John M. Skeriotis, counsel for Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc.; Robert Vitale, CEO for Defendant Midwest; and, Peter Bloom, insurance representative with AIG. A court reporter is not present nor are the proceedings tape recorded. A settlement is not reached. (vlg)This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
January 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER - Pursuant to the 56 STIPULATION to Change Time for Settlement Conference, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the time set for Settlement Conference shall be changed from 2:00 p.m. 2/27/2008 to 11:00 AM, 2/27/2008 in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/29/08. (SAT)
January 28, 2008 Filing 56 STIPULATION Motion to Change Time for Settlement Conference by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Skeriotis, John)
January 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Adjust Date of Settlement Conference. (docket #54). IT IS ORDERED continuing the settlement conference from January 25, 2008 to Wednesday, February 27, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson. The Court's calendar is not available for any dates during the week of February 4, 2008 as requested in Plaintiff's motion and therefore is being set subsequent to February 25, 2008 as further requested in Plaintiff's unopposed motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED affirming all Orders contained within Judge Anderson's Settlement Conference Order entered 12/14/07 (docket #51) except for the date and time of said conference. (vlg) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.
January 4, 2008 Filing 54 LODGED Proposed Order Resetting Settlement Conference (First Request) re: 53 First MOTION to Continue and Adjust Date of Settlement Conference Unopposed by Defendant. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
January 3, 2008 Filing 53 First MOTION to Continue and Adjust Date of Settlement Conference Unopposed by Defendant by Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
December 31, 2007 Filing 52 Notice re Notice of Service by Soilworks LLC Notice of Service of Responses to Midwest's First Set of Request for Admissions, Second Set of Interrogatories, and Second Set of Request for Production (Dosek, E)
December 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 51 SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Settlement Conference set for 1/25/2008 01:30 PM in Courtroom 302, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 12/14/07. (SAT)
December 12, 2007 Filing 50 Minute Order. Pursuant to request of the parties, Magistrate Judge Lawrence O. Anderson having been randomly drawn, IT IS ORDERED referring this matter to Magistrate Judge Anderson for settlement conference. Counsel are directed to contact said chambers to schedule a hearing date and time. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, LOA)
December 7, 2007 Filing 49 Notice re of Errata by Soilworks LLC (Dosek, E)
December 7, 2007 Filing 48 REPORT of Joint Report on Settlement Talks by Plaintiff Soilworks LLC, Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Dosek, E)
December 7, 2007 Filing 47 REPORT of Joint Report on Settlement Talks by Plaintiff Soilworks LLC, Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Dosek, E)
November 27, 2007 Filing 46 Notice re Notice of Service by Soilworks LLC of its Non-Uniform Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents and Things Upon Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc. (Dosek, E)
November 26, 2007 Filing 45 Notice re Service of Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc.'s Second Set of Interrogatories to Soilworks, LLC by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Skeriotis, John)
November 26, 2007 Filing 44 Notice re Service of Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc.'s Second Set of Request for Production of Documents and Things to Soilworks, LLC by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Skeriotis, John)
November 26, 2007 Filing 43 Notice re Service of Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc.'s First Set of Request for Admissions to Soilworks, LLC by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Skeriotis, John)
November 26, 2007 Filing 42 RETURN OF SERVICE of Subpoena Duces Tecum served on Spenard Builders, Inc. on 11/12/2007, filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
October 18, 2007 Filing 41 Notice re Notice of Service of First Request for Production of Documents and Things, and First Set of Interrogatories to Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc. by Soilworks LLC (Dosek, E)
August 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/28/07. (NVJ)
August 13, 2007 Filing 39 Notice re Notice of Submission of Stipulated Protective Order by Soilworks LLC, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Stipulated Protective Order)(Dosek, E)
July 23, 2007 Filing 38 Notice re Notice of Service of Soilworks' Responses to Midwest's First Request for Production of Documents and Things, and Answer to First Set of Interrogatories by Soilworks LLC (Dosek, E)
June 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER re 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Soilworks to Respond to Midwest's Discovery Requests by Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Extension of Time for Soilworks to Respond to Midwest's Discovery Requests)(Dosek, E) filed by Soilworks LLC. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/27/07. (NVJ)
June 25, 2007 Filing 36 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Soilworks to Respond to Midwest's Discovery Requests by Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Order for Extension of Time for Soilworks to Respond to Midwest's Discovery Requests)(Dosek, E)
June 1, 2007 Filing 35 Reply re 22 Reply Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc.'s Reply to Soilworks, LLC's Counterclaim and Counterclaim of Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc. by Defendant Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Skeriotis, John)
May 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/22/07.(NVJ)
May 22, 2007 Filing 33 Notice re Service of Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc.'s First Request for Production of Documents and Things to Soilworks, LLC by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Skeriotis, John)
May 22, 2007 Filing 32 Notice re Service of Midwest Industrial Supply, Inc.'s First Set of Interrogatories to Soilworks, LLC by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Skeriotis, John)
May 22, 2007 Filing 31 Notice re Service of Rule 26 Initial Disclosure by Soilworks LLC (Dosek, E)
May 21, 2007 Filing 30 RESPONSE in Opposition re 26 MOTION to Strike re Counterclaims Asserted by Soilworks, LLC filed by Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
May 18, 2007 Filing 29 Notice re Rule 26 Initial Disclosures by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc (Skeriotis, John)
May 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/11/2008. Dispositive motions due by 5/9/2008. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 5/10/07. (LMR, )
May 4, 2007 Filing 27 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge David G Campbell. Appearances: John Skeriotis (telephonically) for pla; E. Scott Dosek for dft. Scheduling Conference held on 5/4/2007. Order to follow. (Court Reporter Patricia Lyons.) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LMR, )
May 3, 2007 Filing 26 MOTION to Strike re Counterclaims Asserted by Soilworks, LLC by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support# 2 Proposed Order)(Skeriotis, John)
April 30, 2007 Filing 25 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 24 Report filed by Soilworks LLC. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. The correct event is Report re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and it is found in the Other Documents menu. DO NOT RE-FILE. (SAT)
April 27, 2007 Filing 24 REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Plaintiff Soilworks LLC, Counter Defendant Soilworks LLC, Counter Claimant Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E) Modified on 4/30/2007 (SAT). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "REPORT" TO "REPORT re: Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting".
April 17, 2007 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 22 Reply filed by Soilworks LLC. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. (SAT)
April 16, 2007 Filing 22 ANSWER/Reply to 16 Counterclaim, COUONTERCLAIM by Counter Defendant Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E) Modified on 4/17/2007 (SAT). INCORRECT EVENT SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM "REPLY" TO "ANSWER/COUNTERCLAIM".
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 10, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX056344 as to John M Skeriotis. (BAS, )
April 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
April 10, 2007 PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 100, receipt number PHX056345 as to Jill A Grinham. (BAS, )
April 9, 2007 Filing 20 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John M Skeriotis on behalf of Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (BAS, )
April 9, 2007 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Jill A Grinham on behalf of Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (BAS, )
March 27, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER re Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2007 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 603, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge David G Campbell. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/27/07. (NVJ)
March 26, 2007 Filing 16 Midwest Industrial Supply Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Soilworks LLC by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc.(Chen, George)
March 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (FIRST REQUEST) by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, George) filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc answer due 3/26/2007. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/23/07. (NVJ)
March 19, 2007 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT (FIRST REQUEST) by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Chen, George)
March 5, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER denying 8 Motion to Dismiss Case. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/5/07.(NVJ)
December 4, 2006 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Chen, George)
November 15, 2006 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss filed by Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 # 2)(Dosek, E)
October 19, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER pursuant to General Order 05-25 granting 9 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice.Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. (BAS, )(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.)
October 19, 2006 Filing 9 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney John P Passarelli on behalf of Soilworks LLC. (BAS, )
October 12, 2006 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-4# 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint)(Chen, George)
October 12, 2006 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1)(Chen, George) filed by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc, Midwest Industrial Supply Inc answer due 10/12/2006. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/12/06. (NVJ)
October 5, 2006 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (Attachments: # 1)(Chen, George)
September 20, 2006 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Soilworks LLC. (Dosek, E)
September 11, 2006 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Midwest Industrial Supply Inc. (PEM)
September 7, 2006 Filing 3 Filing fee paid 9/7/06, receipt number PHX047896. This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G Campbell. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV06-2141-PHX-DGC. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (PEM)
September 7, 2006 Filing 1 COMPLAINT, filed by Soilworks LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dosek, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soilworks LLC v Midwest Industrial Supply Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soilworks LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Industrial Supply Inc
Represented By: John M Skeriotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Midwest Industrial Supply Inc
Represented By: John M Skeriotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: Soilworks LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Soilworks LLC
Represented By: John Patrick Passarelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Midwest Industrial Supply Inc
Represented By: John M Skeriotis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?