Western Union Financial Services, Inc v. Goddard

Case Number: 2:2006cv02249
Filed: September 19, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 10, 2010 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 110 Stipulation to Order of Dismissal, that this case is dismissed with prejudice, except that this Order of Dismissal shall not prejudice any rights Plaintiff may have to challenge any Geographic Targeting Orders issued after December 7, 2006 or any seizure warrant issued after the date on which this Court dismisses this case. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 03/10/10. (ESL) Modified on 3/10/2010 (JEMB TO INDICATE WO).
February 4, 2010 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' 108 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Defendants shall have through March 10, 2010 to answer, move or otherwise plead to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/4/10. (KMG)
December 7, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the parties Stipulation to Extension of Time to Answer,Move or Otherwise Plead (Doc. 104) is GRANTED. Defendants shall have through January 8, 2010 to answer, move or otherwise plead to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/4/2009. (TCA, )
November 9, 2009 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING the parties Stipulation to Extension ofTime to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead (Doc. 102). Defendants shall have throughDecember 9, 2009 to answer, move or otherwise plead to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/9/2009. (TCA, )
October 7, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 100 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint: Terry L Goddard answer due 11/9/2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/7/2009. (LAD)
September 10, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 98 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint, Terry Goddard answer due 10/9/2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/10/09. (REW, )
April 9, 2009 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 87 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint :, Terry Goddard answer due 5/11/2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/8/09. (TLJ)
March 10, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 the parties' Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Defendants shall have through 4/10/09 to answer, move or otherwise plead to the Complaint in this action. ORDER denying as moot 84 the parties' Stipulation For Extension to Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/10/09. (TLJ)
February 6, 2009 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 82 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint, Terry Goddard answer due 3/11/2009; denying as moot 81 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/6/09. (REW, )
January 8, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 79 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint, Terry Goddard answer due 2/9/2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/7/2009. (LAD)
December 4, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the parties' 77 Stipulation : Defendants shall have through January 8, 2009 to answer, move or otherwise plead to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/3/08. (KMG, )
November 5, 2008 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 75 Stipulation to Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall have through 12/8/08 to answer, move or otherwise plead to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/4/08. (TLJ)
October 7, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 73 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint. Dfts shall have through 11/7/08 to answer, move or otherwise plead to the complaint. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/7/2008. (LAD)
September 8, 2008 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Stipulation for Extension of Time: Defendants shall have through 10/08/08 to answer, move or otherwise plead to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 09/08/08. (DNH)
October 4, 2006 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 STIPULATION To Extension of Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Plead and to Respond to Motion for Preliminary Injunction. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT dft must file an answer to pla's complaint by 11/10/06 and dft must file its response to pla's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 11/06/06. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/04/06. (DNH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Western Union Financial Services, Inc v. Goddard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?