Torres et al v. Horne, et al.

Case Number: 2:2006cv02482
Filed: October 18, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2016 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Defendants' 276 Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment Re: Qualified Immunity. The Clerk of Court shall issue Judgment in favor of Defendants and terminate this case. The Clerk of Court shall forward this Order to the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals (12-17096). Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 6/29/2016. (ATD)
September 4, 2012 261 Opinion or Order of the Court *MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (Doc. 240 .) The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment accordingly. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment. (Doc. 229 .) Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/4/2012.(KMG) *Modified to include text on 9/4/2012 (KMG).
February 10, 2011 216 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 196 Motion for Summary Judgment(re: Standing). FURTHER ORDERED the parties have until Friday, May 13, 2011 to conduct discovery in accordance with the Court's earlier order(doc. 190). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/10/2011.(see order for details)(TCA)
September 3, 2010 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that document 14 must be produced to Plaintiffs.FURTHER ORDERED that documents 81, 202, and 208 are protected fromdisclosure based upon the law enforcement investigatory privilege.FURTHER ORDERED that documents 166, 222, and 229 are protected fromdisclosure on relevancy grounds. As to these documents only, should Plaintiffs believe thatthey are relevant to an issue in this case, they may make an appropriate showing to theCourt.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/3/2010. (TCA)
July 30, 2010 190 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 176 Motion for Leave to File 3rd Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the documents in dispute between the parties are protected as work product, except as to the following: Attorney-Client Privilege: documents 9, 14, and 323 Law Enforcement Investigatory Privilege: documents 25, 81, 126, 130, 131, 132, 133, 166, 202, 213, 222, 228, 229, and 343. For these documents, Defendants must provide the Court with a further showing of the grounds for assertion of the attorney-cli ent privilege and law enforcement investigatory privilege by August 20, 2010. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties have until September 24, 2010 to file any dispositive motions on the issue of standing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the new discovery deadline will be set following the Courts ruling on the standing issues. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 7/29/10.(LAD)
April 10, 2009 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 167 Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit D to Defendants Response to Plaintiffs Filing to Correct Error in Defense Testimony at the 2/25/09 Class Certification Hearing FURTHER ORDERED that Exhibit D, lodged with the court as Document 168 , shall be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/9/09.(MAP)
March 30, 2009 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion 131 for Extension of the Court's Deadline for Fact Discovery, without prejudice and with leave to refile upon the Court's ruling on class certification. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/27/09.(KMG)
January 26, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a class certification hearing will be held 2/25/2009 at 9:00AM before Judge Stephen M McNamee re 79 MOTION to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/26/09. (SAT)
January 7, 2009 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, vacating the dispositive motion deadline set for 1/16/09; vacating the Final Pre-Trial Conference of 2/11/09; the deadlines in this case shall be reset upon the Court's ruling on the 79 , 80 Motions to Certify Class and 131 Motion for Extension of Time of the Court's Deadline for Fact Discovery. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/7/09. (REW, )
November 25, 2008 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiffs have until Friday, December 12, 2008 to submit a Response to Defendants' Supplemental Brief. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/25/08. (ESL, )
November 6, 2008 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dfts have until Friday, November 21, 2008 to submit any additional briefing to the Court regarding the relevancy of the law enforcement officials' testimony. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/6/08. (KMG)
September 9, 2008 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 116 Motion for Leave to File Nunc Pro Tunc Amendment to Reply Memorandum in Support of Class Certification. The Declaration of Plaintiff Lia Rivadeneyra will be considered in connection with the Motion for Class Certification. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/9/08.(LSP)
September 8, 2008 140 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 104 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk is directed to file 105 Plaintiffs' proposed Second Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting 109 Defendants' Motion to Strike paragraph 15, lines 21 to 27. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/8/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres et al v. Horne, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?