Alegre Gonzalez et al v. Tanimura & Antle. Inc.

Case Number: 2:2006cv02485
Filed: October 18, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:1801 Farmworker Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 1, 2009 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 131 Plaintiffs Motion for Statutory Damages for the time being, while expressly granting Plaintiff the right to re-urge this motion if Defendants have not completed a reasonable damages estimate as outlined above within ten days of the date of this order. (Dkt.#131)Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/31/09.(KSP)
July 15, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 129 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint. Status Hearing set 8/24/09 at 4:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 7/14/09.(KSP) JUDGE SIGNATURE DATE MODIFIED FROM 7/4/09 TO 7/14/09 ON 7/24/2009 (ALR).
May 21, 2009 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 121 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 123 Motion for Reconsideration. Status Hearing set 6/22/09 at 4:00 p.m. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 5/20/09.(KSP)
September 30, 2008 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Dft's Motion to Strike portions of the affidavit testimony of Plas Manual Arce, Francisco Tapia, and Antonio Espinoza 96 . FURTHER ORDERED overruling Plas' Objection to Carmen Ponce's Affidavit. FURTHER ORDERED granting Plas' Motion for Leave to File an Objection to Mike Antles Affidavit 114 . Overruling Plas' Objection to Mike Antle's Affidavit 115 . FURTHER ORDERED granting Plas' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 73 . Plas are granted sum mary judgment as to their FLSA and AWPA claims. FURTHER ORDERED granting in part and denying in part Dft's Motion for Summary Judgment 51 . Summary judgment is granted as to Plas' Arizona Wage Payment Act claim. Summary judgment is denied as to Plas' FLSA and AWPA claims. Summary judgment is denied as to Plas' breach of contract and California labor laws and regulations claims. The Court will set a status hearing to discuss how it should proceed on the remaining claims. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/29/08.(KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alegre Gonzalez et al v. Tanimura & Antle. Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?