Morrow v. Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv02635
Filed: November 2, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2008 277 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE; pursuant to the 276 Stipulation for Dismissal; this action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and fees, including attorneys' fees; the Status Conference set for 11/17/08 is vacated. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/27/08. (REW, )
October 9, 2008 275 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying with leave to refile dft's 266 Motion for Summary Judgment. FURTHER ORDERED that a status conference is set for 11/17/08 at 10:30 a.m. The status conference shall be automatically waived upon filing of a stipulation of dismissal by the parties. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/8/2008.(LAD)
November 14, 2006 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER the parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer 7 is GRANTED. Dfts shall have through November 17, 2006, to answer or otherwise respond to Pla's Complaint.Behavioral Services, Inc. answer due 11/17/2006; Bettina Kilburn answer due 11/17/2006 . Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/14/06. (KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrow v. Boston Mutual Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?