Flores et al v. Metro Valley Painting Corporation et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv02675
Filed: November 6, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Denial of Overtime Compensation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2009 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the parties' Updated 188 Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements and Dismiss Lawsuit Replacing the Parties' Previously Filed Joint Motion to Approve Settlement Agreements and Dismiss Lawsuit is granted in its entirety and that the provisions of the Covarrubias Settlement Agreement and the Second Settlement Agreement are approved. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court retains jurisdiction over the settling parties to enforce the terms of the Covarrubis Settlement Agreement and the Second Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/27/09. (SAT)
July 30, 2009 183 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties' Joint 182 Motion to Continue Pending Deadlines and Notice of Settlement is granted to the extent that all remaining deadlines set forth in the Fifth Amended Scheduling Order are vacated. The parties shall file their joi nt motion for approval of the settlement no later than 08/21/09, and, if the settlement does not encompass all remaining plas, a notice that the litigation of this action will continue as to some or all of the "non-participating plaintiffs." Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 07/29/09. (ESL)
February 11, 2009 175 Opinion or Order of the Court FOURTH AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER - granting 174 Motion for Extension of Time and Other Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/29/2009. Dispositive motions due by 6/29/2009. Proposed Joint Pretrial Statement due by 7/21/2009. Pretrial conference of 6/22/09 is vacated. The trial date of 7/14/09 is vacated and Jury Trial reset for 9/22/2009 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/24/2009 11:00 AM before Judge Paul G Rosenblatt. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/10/09.(DMT, )
October 8, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying plas' 63 Motion for Leave to File 1st Amended Complaint; FURTHER ORDERED denying pla's 66 Motion for TRO and Order to Show Cause re Entry of Preliminary Injunction, construed as an application for preliminary injunction. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 10/8/2008.(LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores et al v. Metro Valley Painting Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?