Horton v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company

Case Number: 2:2006cv02810
Filed: November 20, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, MySpine's motion to intervene 148 is granted; USAA's motion to reopen 147 is denied; this case will remain closed. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/27/14.(REW)
December 16, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 110 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 12/16/2009.(NVO)
August 3, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 89 Motion to Strike ; denying 98 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/3/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Horton v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?