Lacy et al v. County of Maricopa et al

Case Number: 2:2006cv02865
Filed: November 27, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Mark E Aspey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2009 323 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pla's 311 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 10/8/2009.(LAD, )
June 3, 2009 251 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying pla's 244 Motion in Limine. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/3/2009. (LAD)
December 24, 2008 187 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot the 154 Motion to Strike; denying as moot the 183 Motion to Amend. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/23/2008.(LAD)
December 23, 2008 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting the 113 Motion for Summary Judgment of the City of Phoenix and Ronald Jones. Defendants City of Phoenix and Ronald Jones are terminated. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/23/08.(ESL) Modified on 12/29/2008 (SAT). DOCKET TEXT MODIFIED TO INDICATE THE PARTY/ROLE TERMINATED BY THIS ENTRY.
February 1, 2008 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part County dfts' 40 Motion to Dismiss the amended complaint; granting in part and denying in part City dfts' 48 Motion to Dismiss amended complaint; DISMISSING counts one, two, four, five, seven, n ine, and ten against dfts Maricopa County and Phillip Keen; DISMISSING counts seven, nine, and ten against dfts City of Phoenix and Ronald Jones; and DISMISSING all counts against dfts Kenny Hansen, Lee Garrett, and Ray Giesel. Accordingly, the foll owing counts remain: 1) Against dfts Maricopa County and Phillip Keen: counts three (alteration of medical findings), six (conspiracy), and eight (derivative claims); and 2) Against dfts City of Phoenix and Ronald Jones: counts one (breach of investi gation policies), two (mishandling of crime scene evidence and failure to report), three (alteration of medical findings), four (lack of probable cause), five (racial profiling), six (conspiracy), and eight (derivative claims). Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/1/08.(REW, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lacy et al v. County of Maricopa et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?