Connor Sport Court International, Inc. v. Rhino Sports, Inc., et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Connor Sport Court International, Inc.
Defendant: Rhino Sports, Inc. and John E. Shaffer
Case Number: 2:2006cv03066
Filed: December 21, 2006
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: James A Teilborg
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 17, 2007 24
Witness List by Connor Sport Court International, Inc.. (SAT)
February 16, 2007 22
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Gordon K Hill on behalf of plaintiff Connor Sport Court International, Inc.. (BAS, )
February 15, 2007 18
MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Samuel C Straight on behalf of plaintiff Connor Sport Court International, Inc.. (BAS, )
February 13, 2007 14
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 13 Joint MOTION for Transfer Related Case filed by Connor Sport Court International, Inc. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. (LSP)
February 9, 2007 12
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 10 Other Notice filed by Rhino Sports, Inc., John E. Shaffer. Description of deficiency: Incorrect document type selected. Do Not Refile.(KMG)
February 7, 2007 11
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Rhino Sports, Inc., John E. Shaffer. (Harris, Ray)
February 6, 2007 10
ERRATA by Rhino Sports, Inc., John E. Shaffer re 9 MOTION for To Modify Permanent Injunction (Brown, Jamie) Modified on 2/9/2007 INCORRECT EVENT TYPE SELECTED. THIS ENTRY HAS BEEN MODIFIED FROM (Notice re Errata) TO (ERRATA) (KMG).
January 30, 2007 7
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Connor Sport Court International, Inc.. (Behm, Douglas)
December 21, 2006 4
Filing fee paid 12/21/2006, receipt number PHX052345. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan R. Bolton. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV06-3066-PHX-SRB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (HIH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Connor Sport Court International, Inc. v. Rhino Sports, Inc., et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhino Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Jamie A Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John E. Shaffer
Represented By: Ray Kendall Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Connor Sport Court International, Inc.
Represented By: Peter M deJonge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?