AGA Shareholders LLC v. CSK Auto Inc

Plaintiff: AGA Shareholders LLC
Defendant: CSK Auto Inc, Maynard L Jenkins, Martin G. Fraser and Donald W Watson
Counter Defendant: AGA Shareholders LLC
Counter Claimant: CSK Auto Inc
Case Number: 2:2007cv00062
Filed: January 8, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 6, 2009 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 234 Motion for Judgment; denying 237 Motion for Judgment; denying 238 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/6/2009.(NVO)
January 16, 2009 264 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 235 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/16/2009.(NVO)
January 8, 2009 243 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part CSK's 235 motion for reconsideration. AGA response to motion for reconsideration due 1/16/2009. No replies permitted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/8/2009. (NVJ)
November 21, 2008 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 163 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 181 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 186 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 210 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 212 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 214 Motion to Strike; denying 215 Motion to Strike. The Court will schedule a final pretrial conference by separate order. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/21/2008.(NVJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AGA Shareholders LLC v. CSK Auto Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: AGA Shareholders LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Ray Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter claimant: CSK Auto Inc
Represented By: Leon Benjamin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSK Auto Inc
Represented By: Leon Benjamin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maynard L Jenkins
Represented By: Leon Benjamin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin G. Fraser
Represented By: Rebecca Bree Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald W Watson
Represented By: Paul J Roshka, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AGA Shareholders LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey Ray Rosenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?