Gil v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Plaintiff: Cindy M. Gil
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00181
Filed: January 23, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 10, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER that Pla's 89 Motion to Strike is denied. Dft JPMorgan Chase's 76 Motion for Summary Judgment RE: Legitimate Non-discriminatory Reason and Pretext is granted. The Clerk of Court shall enter judgment in J PMorgan Chase's favor on Pla's claims of sex discrimination and retaliation in violation of Title VII under Count One of Pla's Second Amended Complaint. Pla's remaining claim under the Arizona Wage Act, A.R.S. § 23-355, is REMANDED to the Superior Court of the State of Arizona in and for the County of Maricopa for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 06/09/09. (ESL)
February 4, 2009 72 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER striking Pla's Bill of Costs 70 and Memorandum 71 of Points and Authorities on Taxable Costs. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/3/09. (KMG) Modified on 2/4/2009 TO ADD TEXT (KMG).
January 26, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER that Dft JPMorgan Chase's 58 Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. The parties may file a motion for summary judgment regarding the issues of legitimate nondiscriminatory reasons and pretext for Pla's sex discrimination and retaliation claims by 02/23/09, if they so desire. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 01/23/09.(ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gil v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Robert Kendall Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy M. Gil
Represented By: Rosemary Stathakis Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?