Morgal v. Arpaio et al

Plaintiff: Allan Kenneth Morgal
Defendant: Tate, Joseph M. Arpaio, Maricopa County Supervisors, Board of and Maricopa (C.H.S.) Medical Dept.
Case Number: 2:2007cv00670
Filed: March 29, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Referring Judge: Edward C Voss (PS)
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 182 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE, pursuant to the Parties' 181 Stipulation, this matter is dismissed with prejudice, with each of the parties to bear its own attorney fees and costs, pursuant to the terms of the Settlement Agreement and Release. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 3/26/13. (REW)
November 5, 2012 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendant's 142 Renewed Motion for Summary Judgment is denied. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 11/5/2012.(LFIG)
August 20, 2012 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER issued denying request for discovery, doc. 161 . Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/20/12. (SJF)
August 3, 2012 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Plaintiff's 160 Request for more time to Respond is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, by way of clarification, that Plaintiff's 165 Response and the 166 , 167 , 168 , and 169 accompanying filings are deemed to have been filed timely; and defendant shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order in which to file, if any, a reply. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 8/2/2012.(LFIG)
July 24, 2012 164 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff Morgal's 155 Fourth Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/23/12.(REW)
July 18, 2012 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, withdrawing the reference to the Magistrate Judge in this case; all matters going forward shall remain with the District Judge for disposition as appropriate; Plaintiff's Notice to the Court 148 is denied as moot. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 7/18/12. (REW)
June 21, 2012 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 156 Motion for Reconsideration of Ruling on 6/5/12. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/20/12.(REW)
June 6, 2012 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, construing the Notice 148 as a MOTION; the defendant, the Maricopa County Board of Supervisors, shall, within 15 days, file a response, if any, to docket entry 148. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 6/5/12. (REW)
May 1, 2012 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the time frames set forth in 143 Magistrate Judge's Order are VACATED. After review of 147 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court re 144 Order on Motion to Amend, this court shall, issue an order setting forth new time frames with respect to defendant's pending renewed summary judgment motion. Signed by Senior Judge Robert C Broomfield on 4/30/12. (LSP)
October 13, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 72 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 78 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 79 Motion in Limine; denying as moot 80 Motion in Limine; granting 92 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment; denying as moot 101 Motion to Conduct In Camera Review; denying Plaintiff's 106 Motion to Strike. ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to close this case. JUDGMENT ENTERED ACCORDINGLY. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 10/12/09.(TLJ)
August 31, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Pla may file a supplemental response to Dft's 92 MOTION for Summary Judgment, together with a separate Statement of Facts and supporting affidavits or other appropriate exhibits, no later than 9/11/09. FURTHER ORDERE D that Dft may file a supplemental reply within 7 days after service of Pla's response. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion for Summary Judgment will be deemed ready for decision without oral argument on the day following the date set for filing a reply unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/28/09. (SAT)
June 18, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/16/09. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying Plaintiffs Motion for a Telephonic Conference (Dkt.#67).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED denying Plaintiffs Motion to Disqualify, referenced in Defendants Response (Dkt.#64) and Plaintiffs Reply(Dkt.#65).IT IS FURTHER ORDERED granting the Motion for Association of Counsel (Dkt.#60). Scott H. Zwillinger is hereby associated as counsel for Defendant Maricopa County Board of Supervisors. (KSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morgal v. Arpaio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tate
Represented By: Maria R Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph M. Arpaio
Represented By: Maria R Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa County Supervisors, Board of
Represented By: Maria R Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maricopa (C.H.S.) Medical Dept.
Represented By: Maria R Brandon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allan Kenneth Morgal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?