Strategic Diversity, Inc v. Alchemix Corp

Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Weiss and Strategic Diveristy, Inc.
Defendant: Robert R. Horton, Cheryl Halota Horton, Alchemix Corporation and Medici Associates, LLC
Case Number: 2:2007cv00929
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 15, 2013 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Motion to Amended the Findings and Conclusions 281 is, in all respects, denied. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/15/2013.(ALS)
August 28, 2013 279 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff Weiss shall have thirty (30) days in which to tender his 250,000 shares of Alchemix stock to Medici and apprise this Court that he has done so. If within fourt een (14) days after the notice has been filed, Medici has not challenged the existence or adequacy of Weiss's tender, the Court shall enter judgment against Medici. Should this Court not receive notice of Weiss's tender within thirty (30 ) days of the date of this Order, then this suit will be dismissed with prejudice, with Weiss possessing his Alchemix stock, but no judgment against the Defendants. (See document for further details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/28/13. (LAD)
August 26, 2013 277 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW: IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Plaintiff Weiss shall have thirty (30) days in which to tender his 250,000 shares of Alchemix stock to Medici and apprise this Court that he has done so. If within fourteen (1 4) days after the notice has been filed, Medici has not challenged the existence or adequacy of Weiss's tender, the Court shall enter judgment against Medici. Should this Court not receive notice of Weiss's tender within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this suit will be dismissed with prejudice, with Weiss possessing his Alchemix stock, but no judgment against the Defendants. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 8/23/13. (LAD)
December 3, 2012 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 229 Defendants' Motion for Judgment and denying 230 Motion for New Trial. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 12/3/12.(DMT)
January 5, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Dfts' Motion 120 for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. Plas' Motion 135 for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. Dfts' requests for judicial notice (Dkt. ## 126, 145) are DENIED. Directing the Clerk of the Court to TERMINATE this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 1/4/10.(KMG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strategic Diversity, Inc v. Alchemix Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth P. Weiss
Represented By: James O Ehinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strategic Diveristy, Inc.
Represented By: James O Ehinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert R. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheryl Halota Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alchemix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medici Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?