Bustamante v. Gonzales et al

Plaintiff: Daniel Bustamante
Defendant: Hector Gonzales, Tim Norton, Kerri Stewart and Philip Steenstra
Case Number: 2:2007cv00940
Filed: May 7, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Jay R Irwin (PS)
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 29, 2010 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #106) and Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. #108); denying 106 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 108 Def endants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The claims are dismissed with prejudice and the action is terminated. The Clerk of Court must enter judgment according. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/28/10.(DMT) DOCKET MODIFIED TO INCLUDE OMITTED DOCKET TEXT ON 1/29/2010 (DTN).
June 18, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 85 and granting 81 Motion to Set Aside default entered against Defendant Maish. Defendant Maish shall file an answer or otherwise respond to the second amended complaint on or before 6/30/09. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/17/09. (LSP)
May 20, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 81 MOTION to Set Aside re Entry of Default Against Defendant Maish : Recommending that motion be granted and that Defendant Maish have ten days from entry of the order to file an answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint (#54). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jay R Irwin on 5/19/09. (DMT, )
September 19, 2008 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ACCEPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. Pla's 28 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is granted. The Clerk shall file Pla's proposed Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 09/18/08. (ESL, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bustamante v. Gonzales et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bustamante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hector Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tim Norton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerri Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philip Steenstra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?