Global Royalties, Ltd. et al v. Xcentric Ventures, LLC et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs Global Royalties, Ltd. and Brandon Hall allege that defendant Xcentric Ventures, LLC operates the ripoffreport.com website in which defendant encourages visitors to post complaints about businesses and individuals, and then leverages the complaints to coerce businesses and individuals to pay for defendant's assistance in investigating and resolving the posted complaints.

Additional Resources

Plaintiff: Global Royalties Ltd and Brandon Hall
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson and Jane Doe Magedson
Case Number: 2:2007cv00956
Filed: May 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Arizona
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Frederick J Martone
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 28, 2008 Filing 35 CLERK'S JUDGMENT it is ordered and adjudged that the Court having granted Defendants, Motion to Dismiss, 34 , Judgment is entered in favor of the Defendants. This Complaint and action are hereby dismissed. (LSP)
February 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting 23 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint and denying 28 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay. The clerk shall enter final judgment for defendants. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/28/08.(LSP)
February 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 33 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 8/8/2008. Dispositive motions due by 9/19/2008. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/23/2009. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/30/2009 at 3:00 PM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Bench Trial set for 2/10/2009 at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 506, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Frederick J Martone. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 2/22/2008. (KAR)
February 22, 2008 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Frederick J Martone: Scheduling Conference held on 2/22/2008. Appearances: Andre Harbon Merrett for Plaintiffs and Maria Crimi Speth for Defendants. Case management plan is as stated on the record. Rule 16 Scheduling Order to follow. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.)(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry.) (KAR)
February 15, 2008 Filing 31 REPORT of Joint Case Management Plan by Plaintiff Global Royalties Ltd. (Merrett, Andre)
January 29, 2008 Filing 30 REPLY in Support re 28 MOTION to Stay PLAINTIFFS' REPLY MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STAY filed by Global Royalties Ltd. (Merrett, Andre)
January 17, 2008 Filing 29 RESPONSE to Motion re 28 MOTION to Stay filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
January 4, 2008 Filing 28 MOTION to Stay by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall. (Merrett, Andre)
December 10, 2007 Filing 27 Notice re of Errata by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson re 25 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Speth, Maria)
December 10, 2007 Filing 26 REPLY in Support re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case re: First Amended Complaint filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
November 30, 2007 Filing 25 RESPONSE in Opposition re 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case re: First Amended Complaint filed by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall. (Merrett, Andre)
November 21, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2008 02:00 PM before Judge Frederick J Martone. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 11/21/07. (LSP)
November 12, 2007 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss Case re: First Amended Complaint by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Gingras, David)
November 1, 2007 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Merrett, Andre)
October 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER denying 19 Motion to Strike, 18 Notice of Filing Supplemental Authority. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/10/07.(LSP)
October 10, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting 13 Xcentric Ventures, LLC and Edward Magedson's Motion to Dismiss Case. Pla shall have to and including 11/1/07, to file an amended complaint, absent which the clerk shall enter judgment without further order of the court. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 10/10/07.(LSP)
October 10, 2007 Filing 19 MOTION to Strike re Plaintiff's Notice of Supplemental Authority by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
October 8, 2007 Filing 18 Notice re Filing Supplemental Authority by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Merrett, Andre)
August 24, 2007 Filing 17 REPLY in Support re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Per Order Dated August 3, 2007) filed by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria)
August 14, 2007 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Per Order Dated August 3, 2007) filed by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall. (Merrett, Andre)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 14 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline to 8/15/07 to file a Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/10/07. (LSP)
August 8, 2007 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merrett, Andre)
August 7, 2007 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case (Amended Per Order Dated August 3, 2007) by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Gingras, David)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER striking 10 Motion to Dismiss Case. Defendants shall have to and including August 10, 2007 within which to file a motion to dismiss in compliance with LRCiv 7.2(e). Also before the court is a stipulation 11 to extend plaintiffs response time to the motion to dismiss to August 10, 2007. We assume that an edited version of defendants motion to dismiss will not be substantively different. Accordingly, we GRANT the stipulation to extend plaintiffs response time to August 13, 2007.. Signed by Judge Frederick J Martone on 8/3/07.(DMT, )
July 24, 2007 Filing 11 STIPULATION to Extend Deadline for Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Merrett, Andre)
July 16, 2007 Filing 10 STRICKEN PER ORDER 12 - MOTION to Dismiss Case by Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Speth, Maria) Modified on 8/3/2007 (DMT, ).
July 11, 2007 Filing 9 Notice re Notice of Errata by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall re 1 Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Merrett, Andre)
June 27, 2007 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Substitution by Donald Joseph Karl, Andre H. Merrett adding Andre H. Merrett and Donald Joseph Karl for Global Royalties Ltd and Brandon Hall (Karl, Donald)
May 14, 2007 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Jane Doe Magedson, Xcentric Ventures, LLC, Ed Magedson. (Attachments: # 1 Jane Doe Magedson Summons# 2 Xcentric Ventures Summons)(LSP)
May 11, 2007 Filing 6 Notice re Summons to Jane Doe Magedson by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall (Karl, Donald)
May 11, 2007 Filing 5 Notice re Summons to Xcentric Ventures, LLC by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall (Karl, Donald)
May 11, 2007 Filing 4 Notice re Summons to Ed Magedson by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall (Karl, Donald)
May 11, 2007 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 1 Complaint filed by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall. Description of deficiency: Party not added to case. The summons attached to the complaint is incorrect: there should be one defendant per summons and days to answer should be 20. (LSP)
May 11, 2007 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re 1 Complaint filed by Global Royalties Ltd, Brandon Hall. Description of deficiency: Address, phone or email information was incorrectly added at the Party Information screen. At the Party Information screen, only the Party text field should be used when appropriate. (LSP)
May 10, 2007 This case has been assigned to the Honorable Frederick J. Martone. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 07-956 PHX-FJM. (entered by LSP)
May 10, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 350.00, receipt number 1222449, filed by GLOBAL ROYALTIES, LTD., BRANDON HALL. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Corporate Disclosure Statement# 2 Summons # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Karl, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Global Royalties, Ltd. et al v. Xcentric Ventures, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Global Royalties Ltd
Represented By: Deana S Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Hall
Represented By: Deana S Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xcentric Ventures, LLC
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ed Magedson
Represented By: Maria Crimi Speth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Magedson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?