American Casualty Company of Reading, PA v. Kemper et al

Plaintiff: American Casualty Company of Reading, PA
Defendant: John Doe Kemper and Valerie A kemper
Case Number: 2:2007cv01149
Filed: June 12, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - There is no right to a jury trial in the context of a Morris reasonableness hearing. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that, to the extent Pla's Motion for Hearing 57 requests that the Court determine the reasonableness of the underlying settlement, the motion is GRANTED. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/18/09. (KMG, )
June 12, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 6/12/09. (MAP)
May 8, 2009 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 57 Motion for Reasonableness Hearing. ORDER setting oral argument for 5/21/09 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 602. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 5/7/09.(TLJ)
February 26, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Kemper's Motion regarding lack of necessity for a reasonableness hearing. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 2/26/09.(DMT, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Casualty Company of Reading, PA v. Kemper et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Casualty Company of Reading, PA
Represented By: Alicyn Marie Freeman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valerie A kemper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?