Ramirez v. Bijins et al

Petitioner: Mario Oaxaca Ramirez
Respondent: Toers Bijins and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 2:2007cv01444
Filed: August 2, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Referring Judge: Jacqueline J Marshall (PS)
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION 11 of the Magistrate Judge; the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied and this action is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 5/12/09. (LSP)
April 15, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part 14 Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for Petitioner to file his objection to the Report and Recommendation is extended to Friday, May 15, 2009. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/15/09.(LSP)
April 9, 2009 13 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF ERRATA - Upon review of the 11 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, the Court noted that the incorrect case number was given at the end for filing objections. However, the correct case number appeared in the caption of the Report and Recommendation. In an effort to correct this mistake, the parties are hereby notified that the correct case number for filing objections to the Report and Recommendation is CV 07-1444-PHX-SMM. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/9/09. (SAT)
March 27, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus : Recommending that the Petition be dismissed with prejudice. Parties have 10 days from date of service of this recommendation to to file specific written objections with the District Court. Case designation is: CV 07-1441-PHX-SMM. See attached PDF for additional infomation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline J Marshall on 3/27/09. (SSU, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramirez v. Bijins et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mario Oaxaca Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Toers Bijins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?