Miller v. McWilliams et al

Petitioner: Wayne M Miller
Respondent: Carson McWilliams and Arizona Attorney General, State of
Case Number: 2:2007cv01461
Filed: July 30, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Referring Judge: Bernardo P Velasco (PS)
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 26, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED adopting the 43 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge in its entirety as the order of this Court. FURTHER ORDERED denying and dismissing the 10 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus with prejudice. FU RTHER ORDERED denying Petitioner's Certificate of Appealability and Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, as Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. FURTHER ORDERED denying Petitioner's 46 Motion for a Certificate of Appealability. FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of the Court to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 1/25/10. (SAT)
September 30, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - This Court recommends that the District Court, after its independent review of the record DISMISS this action in its entirety as untimely and deny Petitioner's 39 MOTION for for Order to Show Cause, 40 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernardo P Velasco on 9/30/09. (SAT)
March 3, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations 25 ; granting 34 Motion to Consider Exhibits; granting 36 Motion to Consider Exhibits; denying without prejudice 19 Motion to Enjoin, Es-Stop, Remove; denying without prejudice 20 Motion to Restore Record. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/1/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. McWilliams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Wayne M Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carson McWilliams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Arizona Attorney General, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?