Patterson v. Shaw, et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Patterson
Defendant: Matthew Shaw, Jeannie Cooper, Ronald Carlson, Gavino Lechuga, John McClaine, Dora Schriro, Jesus Gutierrez, Betty Esterline and Bryant Millwee
Case Number: 2:2007cv01476
Filed: August 1, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 3, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER having granted summary judgment in favor of Jesus Gutierrez, Matthew Shaw, Ronald Carlson, Gavino Lechuga, John McClaine, Jeanie Cooper, Dora Schriro, Betty Esterline, and Bryant Milwee, final judgment shall be entered in this case; the Clerk shall close this case; Defendants' 116 Joint Rule 58 Motion for Final Judgment is hereby denied as moot. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/2/09.(REW, )
September 28, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that summary judgment is entered in favor of Betty Esterline and Bryant Milwee. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 09/28/09.(ESL)
September 23, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 74 Motion for Summary Judgment in favor of Defendant Jeannie Cooper. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/22/09.(LSP)
September 22, 2009 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 71 Motion for Summary Judgment on all claims in favor of Jesus Gutierrez and granting 72 Motion for Summary Judgment on all claims in favor of Defendants Matthew Shaw, Gavino Lechuga, John McClaine, and Ronald Carlson. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 9/21/09.(LSP)
August 19, 2009 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's request for additional discovery 85 .That Plaintiff shall file her Response to Cooper's 74 Motion for summary judgment no later than Friday, September 4, 2009.That Cooper shall file her Reply no later than September 11, 2009. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/18/09. (DMT, )
May 13, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Motion for Leave to File; the Clerk shall file 100 Defendants' Lodged Proposed Amended Reply. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/12/09.(LSP)
December 18, 2008 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 82 Stipulation: Plaintiff shall file her Responses to the Defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment and related Statements of Fact no later than 12/29/08. Defendants shall file their Reply briefs and related Statements of Fact no later than 1/30/09. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 12/17/08. (LSP)
November 18, 2008 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING Dft Schriro's 30 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings in her favor and against Pla Barbara Patterson. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Dft Schriro's 42 Motion to Strike Pla's 36 Response to Defendant Schriro's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. FURTHER ORDERED DENYING Pla's request (doc #36) to file an amended complaint. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/18/08.(SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. Shaw, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Patterson
Represented By: Joel B Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Shaw
Represented By: Susanna Carballo Pineda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeannie Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Carlson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavino Lechuga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McClaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Gutierrez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Betty Esterline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryant Millwee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?