Venezia v. Bentley Motors, Inc.

Plaintiff: Pasquale Venezia
Defendant: Bentley Motors, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv01511
Filed: August 7, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2008 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 158 Minute Entry: that the Clerk of Court will not enter judgment until 10 days have passed. That the parties must file a notice of election by January 5, 2009. If the parties determine that the election is independent of judgment, then the parties need not take any action. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/17/08. (DMT, )
December 5, 2008 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - This matter arises on the Court's review of the file. To date, the parties have not jointly filed a description of the case to be read to the jury. Accordingly, the description of the case will be read to the jury as indicated in this Order. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/4/08. (NOTE: See Order for full details)(KMG, )
November 4, 2008 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 140 Defendant's Motion for Rule 104 Hearing. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/4/08.(TLJ)
October 9, 2008 133 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion in Limine. Pla may not use James Wooley as an expert witness but pla may use him as a fact witness only. FURTHER ORDERED denying 96 Motion in Limine; denying 97 Mot ion in Limine; denying 98 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 99 Motion in Limine. Pla may use the term "lemon law," but pla may not specifically refer to the Arnage as a "lemon." FURTHER ORDERED granting [1 00] Motion in Limine; denying 101 Motion in Limine. The Clerk will note that the docket report incorrectly lists this motion as another motion in limine to exclude evidence of other investigations or cases. FURTHER ORDERED denying 107 Motion in L imine; denying 108 Motion in Limine; denying 109 Motion in Limine; granting in part pla's 110 Motion in Limine to preclude mention of attorneys' fees and information concerning pla's counsel with regard to attorneys' fees. W ith regards to information concerning pla's counsel, the Court has taken this under advisement until the time of voir dire. FURTHER ORDERED denying 111 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part 112 Motion in Limine. Tom LeClair may not testify regarding diminuation in value. FURTHER ORDERED granting 113 Motion in Limine. The parties will jointly submit as set of proposed jury instructions and objections to proposed exhibits by 10/31/08. A continuation of the final pretrial conference will take place on 11/18/08 at 10:00 a.m. A 5-day Jury Trial is set for 12/9/08 at 9:00 a.m. before Honorable Stephen M. McNamee. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/9/2008.(LAD)
February 1, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying Defendant's 25 Motion/Request for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/1/08.(SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Venezia v. Bentley Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pasquale Venezia
Represented By: Ian Jeffrey Pryor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bentley Motors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?