Armstrong, et al v. Florence, Town of, et al

Plaintiff: Travis Armstrong and Blanca Armstrong
Defendant: Florence, Town of, Cardest James and Jane Doe James
Case Number: 2:2007cv01800
Filed: September 20, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Pinal
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2009 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER pursuant to 40 Stipulation of Dismissal: ORDERED that the above entitled case is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorney's fees. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 2/10/2009. (LAD)
January 13, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Stipulation of Dismissal: All of pla Blanca Armstrong's claims are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs associated therewith. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/12/2009. (LAD)
January 5, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 32 Stipulation of Dismissal of Count III. Count III (intentional infliction of emotional distress) of Plaintiffs' Complaint is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs as to this Count. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 1/4/09. (DMT, )
November 4, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED granting the 29 Stipulation to Extend Discovery Deadline. The parties shall complete their non-expert depositions no later than 12/1/08. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 11/3/08. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstrong, et al v. Florence, Town of, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Travis Armstrong
Represented By: Thomas M Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Blanca Armstrong
Represented By: Thomas M Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florence, Town of
Represented By: Lawrence J Wulkan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardest James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?