BMW of North America, LLC, et al v. Mini Works, LLC

Plaintiff: BMW of North America, LLC and Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Defendant: Mini Works, LLC
Case Number: 2:2007cv01936
Filed: October 10, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 9, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING Plaintiff's 69 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall file Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint (Doc. 70). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 3/9/09.(SAT)
January 29, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED denying the 83 Motion to Extend Dfts' Expert Disclosure Deadline. FURTHER ORDERED that all dates set forth in the Court's 1/12/09 80 Scheduling Order remain intact. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/29/09.(SAT)
January 13, 2009 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 81 Stipulation: ORDERED that the stipulated protected order is entered by the Court. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/13/2009. (LAD)
January 12, 2009 80 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER granting 79 Stipulation: Discovery reset to 1/16/2009. Dispositive motions reset to 4/3/2009. FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Final Pre-Trial Conference set for 3/19/09 at 4:00 p.m. A Final Pre-Trial Conference shall be determined up on the Court's ruling on any dispositive motions. FURTHER ORDERED that all other dates set forth in the Court's 6/16/08 scheduling order 45 remain intact. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/12/2009. (LAD)
December 31, 2008 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED GRANTING 75 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion to Amend. FURTHER ORDERED that Dfts' Response to Pla's Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is due Monday, 1/5/09. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/31/08.(SAT)
December 17, 2008 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 72 Defendants' Motion to Adjust Expert Disclosure and Discovery Deadlines without prejudice with leave to refile. The parties shall submit a stipulation by 1/9/09 outlining new dates for expert disclosure, completion of discovery, and dispositive motions. Also, possible dates for a new Pre-Trial Conference should be included in the stipulation. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/17/08.(LSP)
September 12, 2008 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order; Plaintiffs shall make opening expert disclosures no later than November 25, 2008. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/12/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BMW of North America, LLC, et al v. Mini Works, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BMW of North America, LLC
Represented By: Cory Leon Broadbent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bayerische Motoren Werke AG
Represented By: Jay P Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mini Works, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?