Taylor v. Pool Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Billy Taylor
Defendant: Pool Corporation and Horizon Distributors, Inc
Case Number: 2:2007cv01984
Filed: October 15, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 17, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Taylor's 142 Motion for waiver of the bond requirement for a stay pending appeal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 2/16/10.(REW)
January 22, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 134 Horizon's Motion for bond for costs on appeal. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 1/22/10.(LSP)
August 7, 2009 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 123 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/6/09.(DMT, )
April 14, 2009 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 99 Defendant's Motion to Strike re 95 Response in Opposition to Motion; denying 101 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages and granting 102 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time, Defendant shall file a reply by 5/8/09. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 4/13/09.(LSP)
November 7, 2008 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the discovery deadline shall be extended as follows: Discovery due by 12/19/2008. Additional extensions will not be granted. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/6/08. (KMG, )
October 23, 2008 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Dft shall produce Terry Speth for the completion of his deposition. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/23/08. (SAT)
September 10, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Plaintiff's Rule 56(f) motion 39 is granted and denying without prejudice 35 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/9/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Pool Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Horizon Distributors, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?