Doe, et al v. Dickenson, et al

Plaintiff: Jane Doe and John Doe
Defendant: Bill Franklin Dickenson, Phoenix, City of and Alhambra School District
Case Number: 2:2007cv01998
Filed: October 16, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2009 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 154 Motion for Summary Judgment of the City of Phoenix, except insofar as it argues that Pla Jane Doe cannot maintain a section 1983 claim against Dft Dickenson for violation of her right to the society and companionship of John Doe, to which extent it is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the City of Phoenix is TERMINATED from this action. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 4/29/2009. (LAD)
November 25, 2008 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER reaffirming this Court's previous order obliging the City of Phoenix to pay for Mr. Williams deposition time only; denying those requests to oblige the City to pay for Mr. Williams time spent in preparing for the deposition re Pla's 136 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/25/08.(ESL, )
November 14, 2008 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Case and 39 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 40 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Party and 40 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims; and granting in part and denying in part 83 District's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge G Murray Snow on 11/13/08.(LSP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe, et al v. Dickenson, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Stephen G Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Stephen G Montoya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Franklin Dickenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoenix, City of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alhambra School District
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?