Firetrace USA, LLC v. Jesclard, et al

Plaintiff: Firetrace USA, LLC
Defendant: Lawrence Jesclard, Candice Jesclard and Hazard Protection Systems
Case Number: 2:2007cv02001
Filed: October 16, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Roslyn O Silver
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2010 611 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 606 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 09/03/10.(ESL)
January 9, 2009 389 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Defendants will respond to the First Interrogatory from Plaintiffs' Second Set of Non-Uniform Interrogatories To Defendants, dated October 17, 2008, by JANUARY 16TH, 2009. Defendants will respond to the Second Interrogatory from Plaintiffs' Second Set of Non-Uniform Interrogatories To Defendants, dated October 17, 2008, within 5 days of publication of this order. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 1/9/09. (DMT, )
December 8, 2008 346 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AFFIRMING Plaintiff's 10/28/08 subpoenas issued ti BGF Industries, Inc. Aerial Machine & Tool Corp., and Assemblies Unlimited, Inc. pursuant to 320 STATEMENT of Discovery Dispute (re Third Party Subpoenas) with the following changes: All documents provided to Lawrence Jesclard, Candice Jesclard, or HPS(Defendants) in connection with his, her, or its preparation of bids in which the subpoenaed party participated or was asked to participate with Defendants and all communications with actual HPS customers relating to those customers' transactions with HPS. Signed by Judge Roslyn O Silver on 12/08/08. (DNH, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Firetrace USA, LLC v. Jesclard, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firetrace USA, LLC
Represented By: Jay A Zweig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence Jesclard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Candice Jesclard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazard Protection Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?