Kayer v. Ryan

Petitioner: George Russell Kayer
Respondent: Dora Schriro
Case Number: 2:2007cv02120
Filed: November 2, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Cindy K Jorgenson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Death Penalty - Habeas Corpus
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 2, 2016 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 84 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/2/2016.(DGC, nvo)
June 14, 2016 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Claims 1(B)(1), (2), (3), and (5) are denied as procedurally barred; Petitioner's request to expand the record, for evidentiary development, and for an evidentiary hearing is denied, except that Exhibits F and G, Doc. 72, and Appendix A, Doc. 74, are added to the record.; a Certificate of Appealability is denied; within 10 days of this order, the parties shall file simultaneous status reports in the Court of Appeals or move, consistently with the relevant rules, for other appropriate relief re: 09-99027 63 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 6/14/16. (REW)
November 9, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Petitioner's Motion for Reconsideration of Denial of Certificate of Appealability and denying 58 Rule 52(b) Motion to Amend Findings and Rule 59(e) Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/9/09.(LSP)
October 19, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER that Petitioner's 35 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is denied. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. It is further ordered that Petitioner's 46 Motion for evidentiary development, is denied; that the stay of execution entered by this Court on 11/05/07, Dkt. 5, is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED GRANTING a Certificate of Appealability as to the following issues (see attached pdf). The Clerk of Court forward a courtesy copy of this Order to the Clerk of the Arizona Supreme Court, 1501 W. Washington, Phoenix, AZ 85007-3329. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/19/09. (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kayer v. Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: George Russell Kayer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dora Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?