Freelife International, Inc. v. Clear Perceptions Marketing, et al

Plaintiff: Freelife International, Inc.
Defendant: David Lucas Burge, Clear Perceptions Marketing, Gary Boucherle, Noelle Boucherle, Jane Doe Burge, John Does, Jane Does and Black and White Corporations
Case Number: 2:2007cv02210
Filed: November 15, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 25, 2010 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 136 Motion in Limine with respect to use of the word "pyramid"; granting in part and denying in part 165 Motion to exclude expert testimony; granting in part and denying in part 166 Motion to exclude expert testimony. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 3/25/2010.(NVO)
January 29, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 169 Motion to Privately Disclose Attorneys Fees to Settlement Conference Judge and Motion for Expedited Consideration, as follows: a) granted as to Plaintiffs Motion for Expedited Consideration; b) denied in all other aspects. FURTHER ORDERED, pursuant to Rule 26(c), Fed.R.Civ.P., that all parties are hereby prohibited from disclosing or otherwise publicizing the other partys attorneys and experts fees in this case until authorized to do so by Judge Campbell. Counsel shall return all settlement conference memoranda to the settlement conference Judge at the conclusion of the settlement conference for destruction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lawrence O Anderson on 1/29/10.(MAP)
October 1, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion to not file documents under seal as set forth above; Dfts shall re-file their separate statement of facts in support of motion for summary judgmenth consistent with this order; granting in part a nd denying in part 96 Motion for summary adjudication; FreeLife's motion for summary judgment on Burge's counterclaim 96 is granted; The Clerk is directed to file dfts' motion for summary judgment 100 as unsealed; granting 105 Joint Motion to Seal; denying 116 Motion for Leave to File surreply; denying 119 Motion for Summary Judgment. (See document for full details). Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/1/2009. (LAD)
October 20, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 62 MEMORANDUM re: Non-Disparagement Clause re 60 Order by Defendants David Lucas Burge, American Educational Music Publications Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter from Freelife, March 31, 2008)(Ashworth, Andrew) filed by American Educational Music Publications Incorporated, David Lucas Burge, 61 MEMORANDUM re: Points and Authorities Re Non-Disparagement Clause by Plaintiff Freelife International, Inc.. (Craiger, John) filed by Freelife International, Inc. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 10/20/2008. (NVJ, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freelife International, Inc. v. Clear Perceptions Marketing, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lucas Burge
Represented By: Andrew Stewart Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Perceptions Marketing
Represented By: Andrew Stewart Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Boucherle
Represented By: Andrew Stewart Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noelle Boucherle
Represented By: Andrew Stewart Ashworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe Burge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Black and White Corporations
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Freelife International, Inc.
Represented By: John Spencer Craiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?