Totherrow v. Schriro et al

Plaintiff: Phillip Lonzo Totherrow
Defendant: Dora Schriro, Arizona Department of Corrections and Institutional Protectional Committee Board Members
Case Number: 2:2007cv02218
Filed: November 14, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Referring Judge: Mark E Aspey (PS)
Presiding Judge: Paul G Rosenblatt
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 3, 2009 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 49 Magistrate Judge's Report and Recommendation; denying 31 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Add or Join Parties. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 8/3/09.(LSP)
May 13, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS 60 ; denying 56 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Paul G Rosenblatt on 5/12/09. (LSP)
April 14, 2009 60 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 56 MOTION to Amend Complaint: Recommending that that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint which adds additional parties and claims for relief be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 4/13/09. (LSP)
February 9, 2009 49 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 31 MOTION for to Add/Join Parties: Recommending that that the motion be denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mark E Aspey on 2/6/2009. (LAD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Totherrow v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Lonzo Totherrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dora Schriro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arizona Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Institutional Protectional Committee Board Members
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?