American Family Mutual Insurance Company v. National Fire & Marine et al

Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Group and National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2007cv02237
Filed: November 16, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Neil V Wake
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 6, 2012 1035 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 1030 National Fire & Marine Insurance Co.'s Final Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs in the amount of $46,200.10 for attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs. The Clerk shall enter judgment against Plaintiff American Fa mily Mutual Insurance Company and in favor of National Fire & Marine Insurance Company for $46,200.10 for attorneys' fees and non-taxable costs, plus interest at the federal rate from the date of judgment until paid. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 4/6/12.(LSP)
July 23, 2010 960 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Dft Ohio Casualty's 888 Motion for Summary Judgment (Phase II) and National Fire's Phase II 891 Motion for Summary Judgment are granted; that Pla American Family Mutual Insurance Company's 895 Motion for Partial Summar y Judgment Regarding Ohio Casualty Group Phase Two Issues and Pla's 897 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding National Fire & MarineInsurance Phase Two Issues are denied; granting in part and denying in part National Fire & Marine's 942 Motion to Strike Additional and New Information Submitted After Response Deadline. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 07/22/10. (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
March 4, 2010 874 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the supplemental fee claims 834 by National Fire and Owners are granted in the amounts requested. ORDERED that the supplemental fee claim 835 by St. Paul Guardian and Northland is granted in the amount of $4,122.50. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk enter judgment pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d) and LRCiv 54.2 against Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company and in favor of Defendant National Fire & Marine Insurance Company for $16,596.00 for attorneys 9; fees and for $0.00 for non-taxable costs, plus interest at the federal rate from the date of judgment until paid; against Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company and in favor of American Safety Indemnity Company for $45,429.50 for attorneys' fees and for $803.66 for non-taxable costs, plus interest at the federal rate from the date of judgment until paid; against Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company and in favor of Owners Insurance Company for  6;54,582.50 for attorneys' fees and for $596.34 for non-taxable costs, plus interest at the federal ratefrom the date of judgment until paid; and against Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Company and in favor of St. Paul Guardian I nsurance Company and Northland Insurance Company for $61,450.65 for attorneys' fees and for $625.23 for non-taxable costs, plus interest at the federal rate from the date of judgment until paid. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 3/3/10. (LAD)
October 21, 2009 658 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 650 Stipulated Motion for Summary Judgment re: Defendant Western World Company. That the Court expressly determines that there is no just reason for delay in the entry of final judgment in favor of Defendant Western World Insurance C ompany on claims in this lawsuit arising out of its policies issued to Central Valley Specialities, Inc., policy numbers NPP725017 and NPP0742779. The Court directs the Clerk to enter final judgment against Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Co. and in favor of Defendant Western World Insurance Company on Plaintiff American Family Mutual Insurance Co.'s claims in this lawsuit against Defendant Western World Insurance Company arising from Western World Insurance Company's commercial general liability policies issued to Central Valley Specialities, Inc., policy numbers NPP725017 and NPP0742779. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 10/20/09.(DMT, )
September 3, 2009 591 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that Dft St. Paul Guardian Insurance Co's 470 Motion for Summary Judgment (Phase One) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that Dft St. Paul Guardian Insurance Cos request for attys' fees is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that the C ourt expressly determines that there is no just reason for delay in the entry of final jgm in favor of Dft St. Paul Guardian Insurance Co. The Court directs the Clerk to enter final jgm against Pla American Family Mutual Insurance Co. and in favor of Dft St. Paul Guardian Insurance Co.. Signed by Judge Neil V Wake on 9/2/09. (SAT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company v. National Fire & Marine et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Group
Represented By: Cassandra Victoria Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Fire & Marine Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Charles Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Lynn M Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?