Lopez-Sauceda et al v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Jesus Lopez-Sauceda, Maria Lopez-Bojoroquez, Maria S. Alaniz-Gonzalez and Angel Alaniz-Gonzalez
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2007cv02267
Filed: November 20, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: David G Campbell
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 5, 2009 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 70 , 71 Motion to Dismiss Case and Motion for Summary Judgment as set forth in this Order and the Separate Sealed Order 105 . Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 11/5/09.(MAP)
September 4, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 85 Motion to file documents under seal re 87 without prejudice. Plas may file a new motion consistent with this order by 9/18/09. Plas' motion to exeed page limits 85 is denied as moot. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 9/3/2009. (LAD)
August 3, 2009 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 59 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge David G Campbell on 8/3/2009.(NVO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lopez-Sauceda et al v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Lopez-Sauceda
Represented By: Robert Enrique Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Lopez-Bojoroquez
Represented By: Robert Enrique Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria S. Alaniz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert Enrique Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel Alaniz-Gonzalez
Represented By: Robert Enrique Pastor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?