Albano et al v. Shea Homes Limited Partnership et al

Plaintiff: Monica Lewis, Alfred Albano, Samantha Baker, Ariel Barr, Phillip Barr, Keith Bodie and Stacy Bodie
Defendant: Shea Homes Limited Partnership and J.F. Shea Co., Inc.
Case Number: 2:2007cv02359
Filed: November 28, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
County: Maricopa
Presiding Judge: Earl H Carroll
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 1, 2012 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 103 Defendants' Renewed Motion for Attorney Fees and non- taxable expenses in the amount of $171,177.50. This amount of fees and non-taxable expenses is subject to offset based on an amount of compensable sanctions that m ust by paid by counsel for Plaintiffs to Defendants, to be determined by a subsequent Order. That within twenty (20) days of this Order, Defendants must submit to the Court a proposed calculation of the additional expenditures incurred by them due to the multiplicity of the proceedings caused by counsel for Plaintiffs as discussed in this Order. Plaintiffs may submit a response within ten (10) days; there need not be a reply. Granting 104 Defendants' Motion for Sanctions. By subsequent Order, the Court will determine the appropriate compensation sanction that must be paid by counsel for Plaintiffs to Defendants. Signed by Senior Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/30/12.(DMT)
April 6, 2009 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND DECISION OF ORDER granting Dfts' 69 Motion for Summary Judgment as to the Kegerreis Plas in Albano II, CV-07-2359. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Dfts and terminate this matter. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 4/6/2009. (LAD)
November 4, 2008 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER striking Plaintiffs' Offer of Judgment as to Robert & Cynthia Kegerreis 75 . Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 11/4/08. (TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Albano et al v. Shea Homes Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Lewis
Represented By: Robert Hosea Willis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Albano
Represented By: Robert Hosea Willis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Baker
Represented By: Robert Hosea Willis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ariel Barr
Represented By: Robert Hosea Willis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip Barr
Represented By: Robert Hosea Willis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Bodie
Represented By: Robert Hosea Willis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Bodie
Represented By: Robert Hosea Willis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shea Homes Limited Partnership
Represented By: Andrea A Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.F. Shea Co., Inc.
Represented By: Andrea A Hewitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?