Ortega v. Schriro et al

Case Number: 2:2007cv02451
Filed: December 3, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Referring Judge: Jennifer C Guerin (PS)
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2010 166 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS, adopting the 152 Report and Recommendations of the Magistrate Judge as the order of this Court; denying Plaintiff's 141 Motion to Request Leave for 3rd Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 12/28/10. (ESL)
November 17, 2010 152 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS to Deny Plaintiff's Motion to Request Leave for 3rd Amended Complaint re 141 MOTION to Amend/Correct 78 Amended Complaint,, filed by Ernie Pete Ortega. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 11/16/10. (SMBE)
February 9, 2010 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Dfts' 97 Motion to Dismiss. Dfts' 97 Motion to Dismiss is granted. The claims within Count II alleging that (1) Childs refused to issue Pla his Native American items an d (2) Provencio delayed Pla's grievances are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Count V is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. Dfts Hewitt, Sikori, Kraicinski, Owens, and Sambora, Provencio, Childs, Antonelli, and Carrillo are dismissed because no claims remain against them. SThe following claims remain: II, III, IV. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 02/05/10.(ESL)
December 23, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The reference to the Magistrate Judge is withdrawn as to Dft's Motionto Dismiss. Dft's 81 Motion to Dismiss is granted. Count I is dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. The claims within Count II are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust. The following claims remain: Count II with respect to Pla's claims that: Childs refused to issue Pla his Native American items; Provencio delayed Pla's grievances, and Henderson refused Pla's request for a special religious diet; and Counts III, IV, and V. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 12/16/09. (NOTE: See attached pdf for complete details) (ESL)
August 20, 2009 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION to the extent it is consistent with the instant Court Order 55 . ORDER denying as moot Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts Three and Five of Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 31 . ORDER denying as moo t Plaintiff's Motion for De Novo Review of Counts Six and Seven in the Amended Complaint 33 . ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint 48 . ORDER denying Defendants' Motion for Status as moot 74 Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 8/19/09. (TLJ, )
April 6, 2009 55 Opinion or Order of the Court REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re 48 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint: Recommending that the Motion be granted & that the Clk file 49 Lodged Amended Complaint; also Recommending specified counts & dft's be dismissed; that a Service Packet be iss ued for specified dft's & that specified dft's respond as listed; Further recommending 31 Dft's Motion to Dismiss cts 3 & 5 be construed as cts 1 & 2 of the Second Amended Complaint & that Pla not be permitted any further amendment of his Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer C Guerin on 4/3/09.**SEE ATTACHED PDF FOR COMPLETE INFORMATION**(JEMB, )
October 1, 2008 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting the Report and Recommendation 26 of the Magistrate Judge as the order of this Court. FURTHER ORDERED as follows: (1) Counts One, Two and Four and Defendant Schriro are dismissed without prejudice. (2) Defendant Hewitt is required to answer Counts Three and Five. (3) Defendants Kraicinski, Sambora and Owens are required to answer Count Five; (4) Defendant Durrenburg is required to answer Counts Seven and Eight.. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 9/30/08. (KMG, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Schriro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?