Dialog4 System Engineering GmbH v. Circuit Research Labs, Inc. et al

Case Number: 2:2007cv02534
Filed: December 14, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Mary H Murguia
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 09:1 U.S. Arbitration Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 30, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 66 Motion to Compel FURTHER ORDERED granting 71 Ex Parte Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Sara V Ransom and Donald A Wall withdrawn. FURTHER ORDERED granting 76 Notice (Motion) of Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Patricia Ann Premeau for Charles Jayson Brentlinger and Circuit Research Labs, Inc. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 6/25/10.(MAP)
November 30, 2009 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, re: FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW; finding that CRL's breach of Paragraph 4 of the SAR is material; finding that specific performance of the SPA against Brentlinger and the Arbitration Award against CRL and Brentlinger is warran ted; finding that the amount to be paid by Brentlinger to Dialog4 under the SPA is $1,246,340.70, plus prejudgment interest at a rate of 10% per year; finding that the amount to be paid by CRL and Brentlinger to Dialog4 under the Arbitratio n Award is $83,958.00, with prejudgment interest at a rate of 10% per year; awarding Plaintiff its reasonable attorneys' fees and costs; Plaintiff is directed to file its application for attorneys' fees in accordance with LRCiv 54.2; directing the Clerk to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 11/30/09. (REW, )
March 31, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 17 Motion for Summary Judgment. Status Hearing set 4/29/09 at 1:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Mary H Murguia on 3/31/09.(KSP) Modified on 4/1/2009, FILE DATE MODIFIED TO CORRECT FILE DATE, (LSP).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dialog4 System Engineering GmbH v. Circuit Research Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?