Eaton v. Bashas' Inc

Case Number: 2:2007cv02568
Filed: December 18, 2007
Court: Arizona District Court
Office: Phoenix Division Office
Presiding Judge: Stephen M McNamee
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 22, 2009 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 STIPULATED Motion for Entry of Order of Dismissal; dismissing this action with prejudice, each side to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 1/22/09.(LSP)
December 4, 2008 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Stipulated Motion for Entry of Judgment. ORDER that after the preceding has been accomplished, the parties so shall notify the Court and this case shall be dismissed, with prejudice, each side to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs (see order for details). Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 12/3/08.(TLJ)
October 24, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER: Denying plaintiff's re 30 Request to Undertake Discovery. Dispositive motions due by 11/21/2008. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/23/08. (DMT, )
October 9, 2008 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 37 Motion to Continue. The previous hearing scheduled for 10/14/08 is vacated. In-Court Hearing reset for 10/21/2008 09:00 AM before Judge Stephen M McNamee.Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/9/08.(TLJ)
October 3, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting Pla's 35 Motion to Continue Hearing. The previous hearing scheduled for 10/09/08 at 10:00AM is vacated. The hearing has been continued until 10/14/2008 at 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen M McNamee. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 10/03/08. (ESL)
September 23, 2008 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that In-Court Hearing is set for 10/9/2008 10:00 AM before Judge Stephen M McNamee.. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/22/08. (DMT, )
September 2, 2008 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 27 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 9/2/08.(DMT, )
February 1, 2008 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Bashas' Inc answer due 2/14/2008. Signed by Judge Stephen M McNamee on 2/1/08.(TLJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Arizona District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eaton v. Bashas' Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?